EP1312396 - Shin guard [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 05.03.2004 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.03.2004 | Withdrawal of application | published on 21.04.2004 [2004/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kim, Hwi 3/1, 774-43 Yeoksam 2-dong Kangnam-gu Seoul / KR | [N/P] |
Former [2003/21] | For all designated states Kim, Hwi 3/1, 774-43 Yeoksam 2-dong Kangnam-gu, Seoul / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Cho, Man-Hee 602-1002 Songsan Jukong Apt., Minrak-dong Euijeongbu, Kyungki-do / KR | [2003/21] | Representative(s) | Dr. Weitzel & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte mbB Friedenstrasse 10 89522 Heidenheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/21] | Dr. Weitzel & Partner Friedenstrasse 10 89522 Heidenheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 02008988.4 | 23.04.2002 | [2003/21] | Priority number, date | KR20010035014U | 14.11.2001 Original published format: KR 2001035014 U | [2003/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1312396 | Date: | 21.05.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.12.2002 | Classification | IPC: | A63B71/12 | [2003/21] | CPC: |
A63B71/1225 (EP,US);
A41D13/0543 (KR);
A41D13/015 (KR);
A41D27/28 (KR);
A41D13/0158 (EP,US);
A63B2071/1258 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2004/07] |
Former [2003/21] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Schienbeinschützer | [2003/21] | English: | Shin guard | [2003/21] | French: | Protège-tibia | [2003/21] | Examination procedure | 23.04.2002 | Examination requested [2003/21] | 11.02.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 19.02.2004 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2004/17] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US5557804 (QVORTRUP KLAUS [DK], et al) [Y] 1 * column 4, line 65 - column 5, line 23; figures 1,2 * * column 5, line 51 - line 66; figures 1,2 *; | [Y]GB671022 (JAMES PHILIP TAYLOR) [Y] 1 * page 2, line 9 - line 16; figures 6-8 *; | [A]US3898697 (WHITEHEAD CHARLES C) [A] 1 * column 1, line 15 - line 18; figures 2,3 * * column 2, line 29 - line 33 *; | [A]JPH10277198 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19990129), vol. 1999, no. 01, & JP10277198 A 19981020 (ASICS CORP) [A] 1 * abstract * |