EP1262395 - Frame structure for a motor vehicle with compound beams [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.07.2007 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.09.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 14.10.2009 [2009/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dr.Ing. H.C. F. Porsche Aktiengesellschaft Porscheplatz 1 70435 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/36] | For all designated states Dr.Ing. h.c. F. Porsche Aktiengesellschaft Porscheplatz 1 70435 Stuttgart / DE | ||
Former [2002/49] | For all designated states Dr.Ing. h.c.F. Porsche Aktiengesellschaft Porscheplatz 1 70435 Stuttgart / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Burgers, Christiaan Leonberger Strasse 13 71296 Heimsheim / DE | [2002/49] | Application number, filing date | 02009006.4 | 23.04.2002 | [2002/49] | Priority number, date | DE2001126234 | 30.05.2001 Original published format: DE 10126234 | [2002/49] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1262395 | Date: | 04.12.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/49] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1262395 | Date: | 21.04.2004 | [2004/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1262395 | Date: | 06.09.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.03.2004 | Classification | IPC: | B62D21/09 | [2002/49] | CPC: |
B62D25/20 (EP,US);
B62D25/2054 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/49] | Title | German: | Aufbaustruktur für ein Kraftfahrzeug mit zusammengesetzten Trägern | [2002/49] | English: | Frame structure for a motor vehicle with compound beams | [2002/49] | French: | Structure de chassis pour véhicule automobile avec poutres composées | [2002/49] | Examination procedure | 21.10.2004 | Examination requested [2004/52] | 08.03.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.07.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 18.07.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.06.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 06.09.2006 | FI | 06.09.2006 | IE | 06.09.2006 | NL | 06.09.2006 | TR | 06.09.2006 | DK | 06.12.2006 | GR | 07.12.2006 | PT | 19.02.2007 | LU | 23.04.2007 | BE | 30.04.2007 | CH | 30.04.2007 | LI | 30.04.2007 | MC | 30.04.2007 | [2009/42] |
Former [2009/37] | CY | 06.09.2006 | |
FI | 06.09.2006 | ||
IE | 06.09.2006 | ||
NL | 06.09.2006 | ||
DK | 06.12.2006 | ||
GR | 07.12.2006 | ||
PT | 19.02.2007 | ||
LU | 23.04.2007 | ||
BE | 30.04.2007 | ||
CH | 30.04.2007 | ||
LI | 30.04.2007 | ||
MC | 30.04.2007 | ||
Former [2009/18] | FI | 06.09.2006 | |
IE | 06.09.2006 | ||
NL | 06.09.2006 | ||
DK | 06.12.2006 | ||
GR | 07.12.2006 | ||
PT | 19.02.2007 | ||
BE | 30.04.2007 | ||
CH | 30.04.2007 | ||
LI | 30.04.2007 | ||
MC | 30.04.2007 | ||
Former [2008/20] | FI | 06.09.2006 | |
IE | 06.09.2006 | ||
NL | 06.09.2006 | ||
DK | 06.12.2006 | ||
GR | 07.12.2006 | ||
PT | 19.02.2007 | ||
BE | 30.04.2007 | ||
CH | 30.04.2007 | ||
LI | 30.04.2007 | ||
Former [2008/13] | FI | 06.09.2006 | |
IE | 06.09.2006 | ||
NL | 06.09.2006 | ||
DK | 06.12.2006 | ||
PT | 19.02.2007 | ||
CH | 30.04.2007 | ||
LI | 30.04.2007 | ||
Former [2008/04] | FI | 06.09.2006 | |
IE | 06.09.2006 | ||
NL | 06.09.2006 | ||
DK | 06.12.2006 | ||
PT | 19.02.2007 | ||
Former [2007/37] | FI | 06.09.2006 | |
IE | 06.09.2006 | ||
IT | 06.09.2006 | ||
NL | 06.09.2006 | ||
DK | 06.12.2006 | ||
PT | 19.02.2007 | ||
Former [2007/27] | FI | 06.09.2006 | |
IE | 06.09.2006 | ||
NL | 06.09.2006 | ||
PT | 19.02.2007 | ||
Former [2007/25] | FI | 06.09.2006 | |
IE | 06.09.2006 | ||
NL | 06.09.2006 | ||
Former [2007/19] | FI | 06.09.2006 | |
NL | 06.09.2006 | ||
Former [2007/10] | FI | 06.09.2006 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE19504127 (HEERING CARROSSERIEFABRIEK BV [NL]) [A] 1 * column 5, lines 16-34; figures 7,8 *; | [A]DE4414472 (OPEL ADAM AG [DE]) [A] 1* figures 1-4 *; | [A]DE19531957 (FUJI HEAVY IND LTD [JP]) [A] 1 * figures 1-6B *; | [A]DE19812679 (DAIHATSU MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1 * figures 1-6 *; | [A]EP0921055 (HITACHI CONSTRUCTION MACHINERY [JP]) [A] 1 * figures 1-17 * | by applicant | US2136122 | US4674770 |