EP1255321 - Device for electrically connecting an outer conductor of a coaxial cable with removed isolation from a portion of the cable [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.02.2004 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.02.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 14.04.2004 [2004/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Karin Daume Maschinenteile GmbH & Co. KG Engenser Weg 1 30938 Burgwedel / DE | [2002/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Daume, Britta Engenser Weg 1 30938 Burgweded / DE | [2002/45] | Representative(s) | Wagner, Carsten Wagner Dr. Herrguth Patentanwälte Burckhardtstrasse 1 30163 Hannover / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/45] | Wagner, Carsten Leine & Wagner Patentanwälte Burckhardtstrasse 1 30163 Hannover / DE | Application number, filing date | 02009127.8 | 24.04.2002 | [2002/45] | Priority number, date | DE2001207216U | 25.04.2001 Original published format: DE 20107216 U | [2002/45] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1255321 | Date: | 06.11.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.08.2002 | Classification | IPC: | H01R9/05 | [2002/45] | CPC: |
H01R9/0527 (EP);
H01R4/646 (EP);
H01R9/0524 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2003/30] |
Former [2002/45] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Einrichtung zum elektrisch leitenden Kontaktieren eines abschnittsweise abisolierten Aussenleiters eines Koaxialkabels | [2002/45] | English: | Device for electrically connecting an outer conductor of a coaxial cable with removed isolation from a portion of the cable | [2002/45] | French: | Dispositif pour la connexion électrique d'un conducteur extérieur d'un câble coaxial avec l'enlèvement d'une partie de l'isolation | [2002/45] | Examination procedure | 07.05.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/16] | 14.10.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2004/16] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 18.07.2003 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 18.07.2003 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 18.07.2003 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 18.07.2003 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 18.07.2003 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 18.07.2003 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 18.07.2003 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 18.07.2003 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 18.07.2003 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 18.07.2003 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 18.07.2003 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 18.07.2003 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 18.07.2003 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 18.07.2003 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 18.07.2003 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 18.07.2003 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 18.07.2003 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 18.07.2003 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 18.07.2003 | TR   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 18.07.2003 | M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE9307958U (KABEL RHEYDT AG) [A] 1-9* page 3 - page 5; figure 1 *; | [Y]DE9306608U (INTERCONNECTRON GMBH [DE]) [Y] 1,2,4,5,7,9 * page 9, line 6 - page 10; figure 1 *; | [YD]DE19943664 (DAUME KARIN MASCHINENTEILE [DE]) [YD] 1,2,4,5,7,9 * column 6, line 6 - line 67; figure 1 * |