EP1357056 - Corner protector with shock and load resistance properties [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.11.2006 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.12.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 14.01.2009 [2009/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Armacell Enterprise GmbH Robert-Bosch-Str. 10 48153 Münster / DE | [2003/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Karl, Reinhard Lindenberger Strasse 11 88171 Weiler / DE | 02 /
Singer, Anton Im Kastanienweg 6 88299 Leutkirch / DE | [2003/44] | Representative(s) | Finck, Dieter, et al V. Füner Ebbinghaus Finck Hano Patentanwälte Mariahilfplatz 2-3 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/44] | Finck, Dieter, Dr.Ing., et al v. Füner Ebbinghaus Finck Hano Mariahilfplatz 2 - 3 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02009468.6 | 25.04.2002 | [2003/44] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1357056 | Date: | 29.10.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1357056 | Date: | 18.01.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.10.2002 | Classification | IPC: | B65D81/05 | [2003/44] | CPC: |
B65D81/056 (EP);
B65D2581/055 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/44] | Title | German: | Eckenprofil für den Stoss- und Lastschutz an den Ecken von verpackten Gegenständen | [2003/44] | English: | Corner protector with shock and load resistance properties | [2003/44] | French: | Elément de protection de coin résistant aux charges et aux chocs | [2003/44] | Examination procedure | 05.04.2004 | Examination requested [2004/24] | 15.04.2004 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.07.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.11.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 03.11.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.10.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 18.01.2006 | FI | 18.01.2006 | FR | 18.01.2006 | GB | 18.01.2006 | IE | 18.01.2006 | IT | 18.01.2006 | NL | 18.01.2006 | TR | 18.01.2006 | DK | 18.04.2006 | SE | 18.04.2006 | GR | 19.04.2006 | AT | 25.04.2006 | LU | 25.04.2006 | ES | 29.04.2006 | BE | 30.04.2006 | CH | 30.04.2006 | LI | 30.04.2006 | MC | 30.04.2006 | PT | 19.06.2006 | [2009/03] |
Former [2008/52] | FI | 18.01.2006 | |
FR | 18.01.2006 | ||
GB | 18.01.2006 | ||
IE | 18.01.2006 | ||
IT | 18.01.2006 | ||
NL | 18.01.2006 | ||
TR | 18.01.2006 | ||
DK | 18.04.2006 | ||
SE | 18.04.2006 | ||
GR | 19.04.2006 | ||
AT | 25.04.2006 | ||
LU | 25.04.2006 | ||
ES | 29.04.2006 | ||
BE | 30.04.2006 | ||
CH | 30.04.2006 | ||
LI | 30.04.2006 | ||
MC | 30.04.2006 | ||
PT | 19.06.2006 | ||
Former [2008/38] | FI | 18.01.2006 | |
GB | 18.01.2006 | ||
IE | 18.01.2006 | ||
IT | 18.01.2006 | ||
NL | 18.01.2006 | ||
TR | 18.01.2006 | ||
DK | 18.04.2006 | ||
SE | 18.04.2006 | ||
GR | 19.04.2006 | ||
AT | 25.04.2006 | ||
LU | 25.04.2006 | ||
ES | 29.04.2006 | ||
BE | 30.04.2006 | ||
CH | 30.04.2006 | ||
FR | 30.04.2006 | ||
LI | 30.04.2006 | ||
MC | 30.04.2006 | ||
PT | 19.06.2006 | ||
Former [2008/37] | FI | 18.01.2006 | |
GB | 18.01.2006 | ||
IE | 18.01.2006 | ||
IT | 18.01.2006 | ||
NL | 18.01.2006 | ||
TR | 18.01.2006 | ||
DK | 18.04.2006 | ||
SE | 18.04.2006 | ||
GR | 19.04.2006 | ||
AT | 25.04.2006 | ||
LU | 25.04.2006 | ||
ES | 29.04.2006 | ||
BE | 30.04.2006 | ||
CH | 30.04.2006 | ||
LI | 30.04.2006 | ||
MC | 30.04.2006 | ||
PT | 19.06.2006 | ||
Former [2008/20] | FI | 18.01.2006 | |
GB | 18.01.2006 | ||
IE | 18.01.2006 | ||
IT | 18.01.2006 | ||
NL | 18.01.2006 | ||
DK | 18.04.2006 | ||
SE | 18.04.2006 | ||
GR | 19.04.2006 | ||
AT | 25.04.2006 | ||
ES | 29.04.2006 | ||
BE | 30.04.2006 | ||
CH | 30.04.2006 | ||
LI | 30.04.2006 | ||
MC | 30.04.2006 | ||
PT | 19.06.2006 | ||
Former [2007/46] | FI | 18.01.2006 | |
GB | 18.01.2006 | ||
IE | 18.01.2006 | ||
IT | 18.01.2006 | ||
NL | 18.01.2006 | ||
DK | 18.04.2006 | ||
SE | 18.04.2006 | ||
AT | 25.04.2006 | ||
ES | 29.04.2006 | ||
BE | 30.04.2006 | ||
CH | 30.04.2006 | ||
LI | 30.04.2006 | ||
MC | 30.04.2006 | ||
PT | 19.06.2006 | ||
Former [2007/37] | FI | 18.01.2006 | |
GB | 18.01.2006 | ||
IE | 18.01.2006 | ||
IT | 18.01.2006 | ||
NL | 18.01.2006 | ||
DK | 18.04.2006 | ||
SE | 18.04.2006 | ||
ES | 29.04.2006 | ||
BE | 30.04.2006 | ||
CH | 30.04.2006 | ||
LI | 30.04.2006 | ||
MC | 30.04.2006 | ||
PT | 19.06.2006 | ||
Former [2007/28] | FI | 18.01.2006 | |
GB | 18.01.2006 | ||
IE | 18.01.2006 | ||
NL | 18.01.2006 | ||
DK | 18.04.2006 | ||
SE | 18.04.2006 | ||
ES | 29.04.2006 | ||
BE | 30.04.2006 | ||
CH | 30.04.2006 | ||
LI | 30.04.2006 | ||
MC | 30.04.2006 | ||
PT | 19.06.2006 | ||
Former [2007/10] | FI | 18.01.2006 | |
GB | 18.01.2006 | ||
IE | 18.01.2006 | ||
NL | 18.01.2006 | ||
DK | 18.04.2006 | ||
SE | 18.04.2006 | ||
ES | 29.04.2006 | ||
CH | 30.04.2006 | ||
LI | 30.04.2006 | ||
MC | 30.04.2006 | ||
PT | 19.06.2006 | ||
Former [2007/07] | FI | 18.01.2006 | |
IE | 18.01.2006 | ||
NL | 18.01.2006 | ||
DK | 18.04.2006 | ||
SE | 18.04.2006 | ||
MC | 30.04.2006 | ||
PT | 19.06.2006 | ||
Former [2006/52] | FI | 18.01.2006 | |
IE | 18.01.2006 | ||
NL | 18.01.2006 | ||
DK | 18.04.2006 | ||
SE | 18.04.2006 | ||
PT | 19.06.2006 | ||
Former [2006/48] | FI | 18.01.2006 | |
IE | 18.01.2006 | ||
NL | 18.01.2006 | ||
SE | 18.04.2006 | ||
PT | 19.06.2006 | ||
Former [2006/45] | FI | 18.01.2006 | |
NL | 18.01.2006 | ||
SE | 18.04.2006 | ||
Former [2006/36] | FI | 18.01.2006 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP2000255623 ; | [A]US3836043 (LEVIN H) [A] 1* figure - *; | [X]US4838427 (HURLEY RICHARD D [US]) [X] 1,2,8 * the whole document *; | [X]US5899088 (PURDUM HOWARD E [US]) [X] 1,2 * the whole document * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20010103), vol. 2000, no. 12, & JP2000255623 A 20000919 (KAWAKAMI SANGYO KK) [A] 1 * abstract * | by applicant | DE8700165U | DE9111983U |