EP1253722 - Radio frequency switch [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.12.2008 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.08.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 23.09.2009 [2009/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MURATA MANUFACTURING CO., LTD. 10-1, Higashikotari 1-chome Nagaokakyo-shi, Kyoto 617-8555 / JP | [2007/37] |
Former [2002/44] | For all designated states Murata Manufacturing Co., Ltd. 26-10, Tenjin 2-chome Nagaokakyo-shi Kyoto-fu / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Furutani, Koji Murata Manufacturing Co. Ltd. 26-10,Tenjin 2-chome Nagaokakyo-shi, Kyoto-fu 617-8555 / JP | 02 /
Nakajima, Norio Murata Manufacturing Co. Ltd. 26-10,Tenjin 2-chome Nagaokakyo-shi, Kyoto-fu 617-8555 / JP | [2002/44] | Representative(s) | Schoppe, Fritz Schoppe, Zimmermann, Stöckeler & Zinkler Patentanwälte Postfach 246 82043 Pullach bei München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/44] | Schoppe, Fritz, Dipl.-Ing. Schoppe, Zimmermann & Stöckeler Patentanwälte Postfach 71 08 67 81458 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02009492.6 | 10.09.1999 | [2002/44] | Priority number, date | JP19980331073 | 20.11.1998 Original published format: JP 33107398 | [2002/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1253722 | Date: | 30.10.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/44] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1253722 | Date: | 21.01.2004 | [2004/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1253722 | Date: | 20.02.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.12.2003 | Classification | IPC: | H04B1/48 | [2004/04] | CPC: |
H01P1/15 (EP,US);
H03H7/463 (EP,US);
H04B1/005 (EP,US);
H04B1/0057 (EP,US);
H04B1/48 (EP,US);
H03H2001/0085 (EP,US);
H03H2250/00 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2002/44] | H04B1/44 | Designated contracting states | DE, FI, FR, GB, IT, SE [2004/42] |
Former [2002/44] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Hochfrequenzschalter | [2002/44] | English: | Radio frequency switch | [2002/44] | French: | Commutateur radiofréquence | [2002/44] | Examination procedure | 25.04.2002 | Examination requested [2002/44] | 03.05.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.07.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.12.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.09.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.01.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 07.01.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP99118121.5 / EP1003291 | Opposition(s) | 21.11.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.08.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 05.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 26.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FI | 20.02.2008 | IT | 20.02.2008 | SE | 20.05.2008 | [2009/39] |
Former [2008/46] | FI | 20.02.2008 | |
SE | 20.05.2008 | ||
Former [2008/39] | FI | 20.02.2008 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH10145270 ; | [A]EP0820155 (MURATA MANUFACTURING CO [JP]) [A] 1-17 * abstract * * column 3, line 10 - column 5, line 46 * * figures 1,4 *; | [A]WO9831109 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE]) [A] 1-17 * abstract * * page 6, line 15 - page 15, line 2 * * figures 1-10 *; | [A]US5815804 (NEWELL MICHAEL A [US], et al) [A] 1-17 * abstract * * figure 2 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19980831), vol. 1998, no. 10, & JP10145270 A 19980529 (MURATA MFG CO LTD) [A] 1-17 * abstract * |