Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP4392139B | Global Dossier | 24.12.2009 | B2 | JP2002339276 | 27.11.2002 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2001139065 | 09.05.2001 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1256652 | Global Dossier | 05.03.2008 | B1 | EP1256652 | 30.06.2004 | A3 | EP1256652 | 13.11.2002 | A2 | Priority number | Date | JP2001139065 | 09.05.2001 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN100418739C | 17.09.2008 | C | CN1390697 | 15.01.2003 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2001139065 | 09.05.2001 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE60225371T | 12.03.2009 | T2 | DE60225371D1 | 17.04.2008 | D1 | Priority number | Date | JP2001139065 | 09.05.2001 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6805178 | 19.10.2004 | B2 | US2002185205 | 12.12.2002 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2001139065 | 09.05.2001 |