EP1256652 - Metallic cord [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.01.2009 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.01.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 11.02.2009 [2009/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sumitomo Rubber Industries, Ltd. 6-9, Wakinohama-cho, 3-chome, Chuo-ku Kobe-shi Hyogo-ken / JP | [2008/10] |
Former [2002/46] | For all designated states Sumitomo Rubber Industries Ltd. 6-9, Wakinohama-cho, 3-chome, Chuo-ku Kobe-shi, Hyogo-ken / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Miyazaki, Shinichi Sumitomo Rubber Ind., Ltd., 3-6-9, Wakinohama-cho Chuo-ku, Kobe-shi, Hyogo-ken / JP | 02 /
Yamazaki, Kazumi Sumitomo Rubber Ind., Ltd., 3-6-9, Wakinohama-cho Chuo-ku, Kobe-shi, Hyogo-ken / JP | 03 /
Toda, Osamu Sumitomo Rubber Ind., Ltd., 3-6-9, Wakinohama-cho Chuo-ku, Kobe-shi, Hyogo-ken / JP | [2002/46] | Representative(s) | Manitz Finsterwald Patent- und Rechtsanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Postfach 31 02 20 80102 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/46] | Manitz, Finsterwald & Partner GbR Postfach 31 02 20 80102 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02009804.2 | 30.04.2002 | [2002/46] | Priority number, date | JP20010139065 | 09.05.2001 Original published format: JP 2001139065 | [2002/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1256652 | Date: | 13.11.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/46] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1256652 | Date: | 30.06.2004 | [2004/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1256652 | Date: | 05.03.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.05.2004 | Classification | IPC: | D07B1/06 | [2002/46] | CPC: |
D07B1/0646 (EP,US);
D07B2201/2008 (EP,US);
D07B2201/2022 (EP,US);
D07B2201/2024 (EP,US);
D07B2501/2046 (EP,US);
Y10S57/902 (EP,US);
Y10T152/10765 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2005/12] |
Former [2002/46] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Metallseil | [2002/46] | English: | Metallic cord | [2002/46] | French: | Câble métallique | [2002/46] | Examination procedure | 06.12.2004 | Examination requested [2005/05] | 31.12.2004 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 19.04.2005 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, GR, IE, IT, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | 12.04.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.10.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.09.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.12.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 04.12.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.12.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 03.02.2005 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 03.02.2005 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 03.02.2005 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 03.02.2005 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 03.02.2005 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 03.02.2005 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 03.02.2005 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 03.02.2005 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 03.02.2005 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 03.02.2005 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 03.02.2005 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 03.02.2005 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 03.02.2005 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 03.02.2005 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 03.02.2005 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 03.02.2005 | TR   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JP2000129583 ; | [X]JP2000198311 ; | [A]JPH1111107 ; | [A]US3273978 (FREDERIC PAUL FRANCIS VICTOR) [A] 1-3,5,7-11,13 * column 2, line 34 - line 69 * * column 3, line 25 - line 48 * * column 1, line 50 - line 56 *; | [A]EP0462716 (TOKUSEN KOGYO COMPANY LIMITED [JP]) [A] 1-3,5-13 * column 5, line 57 - column 6, line 12; claims 1,2,6,7 *; | [A]WO9928547 (BEKAERT SA NV [BE], et al) [A] 1-13 * page 9, line 11 - page 12, line 18; figure - *; | [A]US5968651 (DE VOS XAVIER [BE], et al) [A] 1,4* column 2, line 10 - line 30 *; | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20001006), vol. 2000, no. 08, & JP2000129583 A 20000509 (YOKOHAMA RUBBER CO LTD:THE) [X] 1-3,5,8-13 * abstract * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20001117), vol. 2000, no. 10, & JP2000198311 A 20000718 (TOYO TIRE & RUBBER CO LTD) [X] 1-3,5,8-13 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19961129), vol. 1996, no. 11, & JP8176979 A 19960709 (BRIDGESTONE CORP) [A] 1,6,8-13 * abstract * | [A] - "PROCESS FOR THE MANUFACTURE OF A STRAND, AS WELL AS A STRAND MADE ACCORDING TO THIS PROCESS AND ELASTOMER OR SYNTHETIC MATERIAL OBJECTS REINFORCED WITH SUCH STRANDS", RESEARCH DISCLOSURE, KENNETH MASON PUBLICATIONS, HAMPSHIRE, GB, (197811), no. 17534, ISSN 0374-4353, pages 26 - 28, XP001066488 [A] 1,2,8-11,13 * page 27, column R, line 5 - line 14 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19990430), vol. 1999, no. 04, & JP11011107 A 19990119 (BRIDGESTONE CORP) [A] 1-5,7-11,13 * abstract * |