EP1258438 - Storage rack [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.02.2007 Database last updated on 21.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.12.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 14.01.2009 [2009/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Gebr. Willach GmbH Stein 2 53809 Ruppichteroth / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/15] | For all designated states GEBR. WILLACH GmbH Stein 2 53809 Ruppichteroth / DE | ||
Former [2002/47] | For all designated states GEBR. WILLACH GmbH Stein 2 D-53809 Ruppichteroth / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Willach, Ulrich Am Hang 25 53819 Neunkirchen-Seelscheid / DE | 02 /
Schmitt, Werner Im Saurental 4 53809 Ruppichteroth-Schönenberg / DE | [2002/47] | Representative(s) | dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/47] | Selting, Günther, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte von Kreisler, Selting, Werner Postfach 10 22 41 50462 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 02009848.9 | 02.05.2002 | [2002/47] | Priority number, date | DE2001208392U | 18.05.2001 Original published format: DE 20108392 U | [2002/47] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1258438 | Date: | 20.11.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1258438 | Date: | 12.04.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.08.2002 | Classification | IPC: | B65G1/137 | [2002/47] | CPC: |
G07F17/0092 (EP);
B65G1/1373 (EP);
B65G2203/0216 (EP);
B65G2203/044 (EP);
B65G2209/04 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/47] | Title | German: | Lagerregal | [2002/47] | English: | Storage rack | [2002/47] | French: | Rayonnage de stockage | [2002/47] | Examination procedure | 08.05.2003 | Examination requested [2003/28] | 05.04.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.06.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.10.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.01.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 12.01.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.01.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 12.04.2006 | FI | 12.04.2006 | IE | 12.04.2006 | TR | 12.04.2006 | LU | 02.05.2006 | MC | 31.05.2006 | DK | 12.07.2006 | GR | 13.07.2006 | PT | 12.09.2006 | [2009/03] |
Former [2008/37] | FI | 12.04.2006 | |
IE | 12.04.2006 | ||
TR | 12.04.2006 | ||
LU | 02.05.2006 | ||
MC | 31.05.2006 | ||
DK | 12.07.2006 | ||
GR | 13.07.2006 | ||
PT | 12.09.2006 | ||
Former [2008/20] | FI | 12.04.2006 | |
IE | 12.04.2006 | ||
MC | 31.05.2006 | ||
DK | 12.07.2006 | ||
GR | 13.07.2006 | ||
PT | 12.09.2006 | ||
Former [2007/45] | FI | 12.04.2006 | |
IE | 12.04.2006 | ||
MC | 31.05.2006 | ||
DK | 12.07.2006 | ||
PT | 12.09.2006 | ||
Former [2007/37] | FI | 12.04.2006 | |
IE | 12.04.2006 | ||
IT | 12.04.2006 | ||
MC | 31.05.2006 | ||
DK | 12.07.2006 | ||
PT | 12.09.2006 | ||
Former [2007/12] | FI | 12.04.2006 | |
IE | 12.04.2006 | ||
MC | 31.05.2006 | ||
DK | 12.07.2006 | ||
PT | 12.09.2006 | ||
Former [2007/10] | FI | 12.04.2006 | |
MC | 31.05.2006 | ||
DK | 12.07.2006 | ||
PT | 12.09.2006 | ||
Former [2007/07] | FI | 12.04.2006 | |
MC | 31.05.2006 | ||
DK | 12.07.2006 | ||
Former [2006/52] | FI | 12.04.2006 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE4302711 (ZAMBELLI STAHLMOEBEL GMBH & CO [DE]) [X] 1-7,9,10 * abstract *; | [A]US5536916 (KOHARI TOSHIO [JP], et al) [A] 1,2,4,5 * abstract * * column 4, line 1 - line 13 *; | [X]DE19620569 (TEAM TECHNOLOGY ENGINEERING & [DE]) [X] 1-3,6-8 * abstract *; | [A]US6003771 (KUSTERS JAN T [NL]) [A] 1-3,6,7* column 4, line 52 - column 5, line 23; figure -; claim - * | by applicant | DE9301327U | EP0991036 |