EP1256592 - Amorphous perfluorinated copolymers [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.05.2008 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.08.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 15.09.2010 [2010/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Solvay Solexis S.p.A. Via Turati, 12 20121 Milano / IT | [2007/28] |
Former [2003/14] | For all designated states Solvay Solexis S.p.A. Via Turati, 12 20121 Milano / IT | ||
Former [2003/13] | For all designated states AGORA' S.p.A. Via Turati, 12 20121 Milano / IT | ||
Former [2002/46] | For all designated states Ausimont S.p.A. Piazzetta Maurilio Bossi 3 20121 Milano / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Apostolo, Marco Via Carola 28 28043 Bellinzago, Novara / IT | 02 /
Triulzi, Francesco Via Marinetti 3 20100 Milano / IT | 03 /
Arcella, Vincenzo Via Giovanni XXIII, 21 20014 Nerviano, Milano / IT | 04 /
Tortelli, Vito Viale Corsica 46 20100 Milano / IT | 05 /
Calini, Pierangelo Via Capuana 3 20017 Rho, Milano / IT | [2002/46] | Representative(s) | Sama, Daniele, et al Sama Patents Via G.B. Morgagni, 2 20129 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2002/46] | Sama, Daniele, Dr., et al Sama Patents, Via G.B. Morgagni, 2 20129 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 02009935.4 | 03.05.2002 | [2002/46] | Priority number, date | IT2001MI00921 | 07.05.2001 Original published format: IT MI20010921 | IT2002MI00833 | 19.04.2002 Original published format: IT MI20020833 | [2002/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1256592 | Date: | 13.11.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1256592 | Date: | 11.07.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.09.2002 | Classification | IPC: | C08F8/22, G02B1/04 | [2002/46] | CPC: |
G02B1/046 (EP,US);
B29D11/00721 (EP,US);
C08F8/22 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C08F8/22, C08F214/18 (US,EP);
G02B1/046, C08L45/00 (EP,US) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/46] | Title | German: | Amorphe perfluorierte Polymere | [2002/46] | English: | Amorphous perfluorinated copolymers | [2002/46] | French: | Polymères amorphes perfluorés | [2002/46] | Examination procedure | 24.04.2003 | Examination requested [2003/26] | 13.02.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.06.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.01.2007 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 22.02.2007 | 22.01.2007 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 30.01.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 22.02.2007 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 23.02.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.03.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.05.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 25.05.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.04.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 11.07.2007 | BE | 11.07.2007 | CH | 11.07.2007 | CY | 11.07.2007 | DK | 11.07.2007 | FI | 11.07.2007 | LI | 11.07.2007 | NL | 11.07.2007 | TR | 11.07.2007 | SE | 11.10.2007 | GR | 12.10.2007 | ES | 22.10.2007 | PT | 11.12.2007 | [2010/37] |
Former [2009/33] | AT | 11.07.2007 | |
BE | 11.07.2007 | ||
CH | 11.07.2007 | ||
CY | 11.07.2007 | ||
DK | 11.07.2007 | ||
FI | 11.07.2007 | ||
LI | 11.07.2007 | ||
NL | 11.07.2007 | ||
SE | 11.10.2007 | ||
GR | 12.10.2007 | ||
ES | 22.10.2007 | ||
PT | 11.12.2007 | ||
Former [2008/28] | AT | 11.07.2007 | |
BE | 11.07.2007 | ||
CH | 11.07.2007 | ||
DK | 11.07.2007 | ||
FI | 11.07.2007 | ||
LI | 11.07.2007 | ||
NL | 11.07.2007 | ||
SE | 11.10.2007 | ||
GR | 12.10.2007 | ||
ES | 22.10.2007 | ||
PT | 11.12.2007 | ||
Former [2008/23] | AT | 11.07.2007 | |
BE | 11.07.2007 | ||
CH | 11.07.2007 | ||
DK | 11.07.2007 | ||
FI | 11.07.2007 | ||
LI | 11.07.2007 | ||
NL | 11.07.2007 | ||
GR | 12.10.2007 | ||
ES | 22.10.2007 | ||
PT | 11.12.2007 | ||
Former [2008/20] | AT | 11.07.2007 | |
BE | 11.07.2007 | ||
CH | 11.07.2007 | ||
FI | 11.07.2007 | ||
LI | 11.07.2007 | ||
NL | 11.07.2007 | ||
GR | 12.10.2007 | ||
ES | 22.10.2007 | ||
PT | 11.12.2007 | ||
Former [2008/13] | AT | 11.07.2007 | |
CH | 11.07.2007 | ||
FI | 11.07.2007 | ||
LI | 11.07.2007 | ||
NL | 11.07.2007 | ||
ES | 22.10.2007 | ||
PT | 11.12.2007 | ||
Former [2008/10] | FI | 11.07.2007 | |
NL | 11.07.2007 | ||
ES | 22.10.2007 | ||
PT | 11.12.2007 | ||
Former [2008/09] | NL | 11.07.2007 | |
ES | 22.10.2007 | ||
Former [2008/08] | ES | 22.10.2007 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0226668 (DU PONT [US]) [A] 1 * page 3, line 17 - line 37 * * page 4, line 21 - page 5, line 7; claims 1-4 *; | [Y]EP0302513 (DAIKIN IND LTD [JP]) [Y] 1-24 * claims 1-10 *; | [Y]EP0338755 (TOKUYAMA SODA KK [JP]) [Y] 1-24 * page 6, line 3 - line 34; claims 1-7 *; | [Y]EP0645406 (DU PONT [US]) [Y] 1-24 * page 3, line 31 - page 4, line 16; claims 1-21 *; | [A]EP0784064 (AUSIMONT SPA [IT]) [A] 1* claims 1-11 *; | [Y]EP0918060 (ASAHI GLASS CO LTD [JP]) [Y] 1-24 * page 2, line 49 - page 6, line 30; claims 1-10 *; | [A]EP0969025 (AUSIMONT SPA [IT]) [A] 1 * claims 1-22 * |