Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
25.11.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 11.01.2006 [2006/02] |
14.01.2005 | Change - representative | published on 02.03.2005 [2005/09] |
03.12.2004 | (Expected) grant | published on 19.01.2005 [2005/03] |
27.08.2004 | New entry: Payment of fee for grant | |
27.08.2004 | New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing | |
28.07.2004 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | |
30.06.2004 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: payment of fee | |
30.06.2004 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
15.06.2004 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit | |
05.11.2003 | Deletion: Fee payment for extension state | |
05.11.2003 | Deletion: Withdrawal of extension state | |
11.07.2003 | Definitive list of designations | published on 27.08.2003 [2003/35] |
01.11.2002 | Request for examination filed | published on 18.12.2002 [2002/51] |
18.10.2002 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 04.12.2002 [2002/49] |