Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE50202028D1 | 24.02.2005 | D1 | Priority number | Date | DE10125481 | 25.05.2001 | DE50202028 | 06.05.2002 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1262274 | Global Dossier | 19.01.2005 | B1 | EP1262274 | 04.12.2002 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE10125481 | 25.05.2001 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE287315T | 15.02.2005 | T1 | Priority number | Date | DE10125481 | 25.05.2001 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE10125481 | 22.08.2002 | C1 | Priority number | Date | DE10125481 | 25.05.2001 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2236388T | 16.07.2005 | T3 | Priority number | Date | DE10125481 | 25.05.2001 |