EP1262274 - Apparatus for reshaping the caps of spot welding electrodes [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.11.2005 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.11.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 11.01.2006 [2006/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bräuer, Andreas Am Kirchsteig 8 09456 Annaberg-Buchholz / DE | [2002/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2002/49] | Representative(s) | Köhler, Manfred Manfred Köhler und Kollegen Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Kohlgartenstrasse 33 - 35 D-04315 Leipzig / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/09] | Köhler, Manfred Manfred Köhler und Kollegen Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Kohlgartenstrasse 33 - 35 D-04315 Leipzig / DE | ||
Former [2002/49] | Kath, Gunther (DE) Dr.-Dieckmann-Strasse 26 D-08280 Aue / DE | Application number, filing date | 02010030.1 | 06.05.2002 | [2002/49] | Priority number, date | DE2001125481 | 25.05.2001 Original published format: DE 10125481 | [2002/49] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1262274 | Date: | 04.12.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1262274 | Date: | 19.01.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.08.2002 | Classification | IPC: | B23K35/40, B23B5/16, B23K11/30 | [2002/49] | CPC: |
B23K35/402 (EP);
B23B5/166 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, DE, ES, GB, IT [2003/35] |
Former [2002/49] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Umformen von Elekrodenkappen | [2002/49] | English: | Apparatus for reshaping the caps of spot welding electrodes | [2002/49] | French: | Dispositif pour la remise en forme des capuchons d'électrodes de soudage | [2002/49] | Examination procedure | 21.10.2002 | Examination requested [2002/51] | 06.08.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.08.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 17.08.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.10.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2004 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   18.06.2004 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4856949 (SHIMADA TOSHIAKI [JP]) [A] 1-3 * figures 1-9 *; | [A]US4916931 (KAESELER WERNER [DE]) [A] 1-3* figures 1,2 *; | [AD]DE20100102U (SCHWEISTECHNIK BRAEUER GMBH [DE]) [AD] 1-3 * figures 1,2 * |