EP1296438 - Rotary electric machine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.01.2007 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.01.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 21.02.2007 [2007/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hitachi, Ltd. 6-6, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2006/11] | For all designated states Hitachi, Ltd. 6-6, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | ||
Former [2003/13] | For all designated states Hitachi, Ltd. 6, Kanda Surugadai 4-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 101-8010 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Aoyama, Hiroshi, Hitachi, Ltd., Int.Prop.Group New Marunouchi Bldg., 5-1 Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-8220 / JP | 02 /
Gotou, Kazuo, Hitachi, Ltd., Int.Prop.Group New Marunouchi Bldg., 5-1 Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-8220 / JP | 03 /
Ejima, Hidehiro, Hitachi, Ltd., Int.Prop.Group New Marunouchi Bldg., 5-1 Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-8220 / JP | 04 /
Shibata, Takashi, Hitachi, Ltd., Int.Prop.Group New Marunouchi Bldg., 5-1 Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-8220 / JP | [2004/14] |
Former [2003/13] | 01 /
Aoyama, Hiroshi, Hitachi, Ltd., Int.Prop.Group New Marunouchi Bldg., 5-1 Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-8220 / JP | ||
02 /
Gotou, Kazuo, Hitachi, Ltd., Int.Prop.Group New Marunouchi Bldg., 5-1 Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-8220 / JP | |||
03 /
Ejima, Hidehiro, Hitachi, Ltd., Int.Prop.Group New Marunouchi Bldg., 5-1 Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-8220 / JP | |||
04 /
Shibita, Takashi, Hitachi, Ltd., Int.Prop.Group New Marunouchi Bldg., 5-1 Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-8220 / JP | Representative(s) | Beetz & Partner mbB Patentanwälte Prinzregentenstraße 54 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/13] | Beetz & Partner Patentanwälte Steinsdorfstrasse 10 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02010116.8 | 08.05.2002 | [2003/13] | Priority number, date | JP20010287993 | 21.09.2001 Original published format: JP 2001287993 | [2003/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1296438 | Date: | 26.03.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/13] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1296438 | Date: | 26.11.2003 | [2003/48] | Type: | A9 Corrected patent application | No.: | EP1296438 | Date: | 31.03.2004 | [2004/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1296438 | Date: | 15.03.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.10.2003 | Classification | IPC: | H02K3/48, H02K3/40, H02K3/30 | [2003/48] | CPC: |
H02K3/30 (EP,US);
H02K3/40 (EP,US);
H02K3/48 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2003/13] | H02K3/48, H02K3/40, H02K3/34 | Designated contracting states | DE, GB [2004/34] |
Former [2003/13] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Rotierende elektrische Maschine | [2003/13] | English: | Rotary electric machine | [2003/13] | French: | Machine électrique tournante | [2003/13] | Examination procedure | 16.03.2004 | Examination requested [2004/20] | 17.06.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.10.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.09.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.01.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 09.01.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.12.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3845438 (MENDELSOHN M, et al) [A] 1-9 * column 2, line 3 - line 42 *; | [A]US4473765 (BUTMAN JR THOMAS R [US], et al) [A] 1-9 * column 4, line 10 - line 32; figures 1,2 *; | [A]US4582749 (BOULTER EDWARD A [US], et al) [A] 1-9 * column 4, line 10 - column 5, line 50; figures 3-6 *; | [A]EP0406477 (NIPPON RIKA KOGYOSHO KK [JP]) [A] 1-9* page 3, line 27 - line 58; figures 1-5 *; | [A]US5066881 (ELTON RICHARD K [US], et al) [A] 1-9 * column 3, line 58 - column 4, line 57; figures 1-3,6 *; | [A]US5300844 (SCHULER ROLAND [CH]) [A] 1-9 * column 2, line 58 - column 3, line 17; figures 1-4 *; | [A]EP0915484 (TOSHIBA KK [JP], et al) [A] 1-9 * page 5, line 41 - line 51 *; | [A]EP1126578 (HITACHI LTD [JP]) [A] 1-9 * column 8, line 1 - line 46; figure 4 * |