EP1362890 - Corrugated polymeric tubing or conduit having reduced change in length [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 26.08.2016 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.08.2016 | Patent maintained (B2 publication) | published on 28.09.2016 [2016/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states EMS-CHEMIE AG Via Innovativa 1 7013 Domat-Ems / CH | [2010/07] |
Former [2003/47] | For all designated states EMS-Chemie AG Reichenauerstrasse 7013 Domat/Ems / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Thullen, Helmut Dipl.-Chem. Versamerstrasse 39 7402 Bonaduz / CH | 02 /
Stoeppelmann, Georg Dr. rer. nat. Gassa Sableun 2 7402 Bonaduz / CH | 03 /
Kettl, Ralph, Dipl.-Ing. Versamerstrasse 7 7402 Bonaduz / CH | 04 /
Hoffmann, Michael Dipl.-Techn. Via Ruver 20 7402 Bonaduz / CH | [2003/47] | Representative(s) | Bremi, Tobias Hans, et al Isler & Pedrazzini AG Giesshübelstrasse 45 Postfach 1772 8027 Zürich / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2016/39] | Bremi, Tobias Hans, et al Isler & Pedrazzini AG Postfach 1772 8027 Zürich / CH | ||
Former [2010/23] | Bremi, Tobias Hans, et al Isler & Pedrazzini AG Postfach 1772 8027 Zürich / CH | ||
Former [2010/20] | (deleted) | ||
Former [2003/47] | Becker Kurig Straus Patentanwälte Bavariastrasse 7 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02010352.9 | 07.05.2002 | [2003/47] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1362890 | Date: | 19.11.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1362890 | Date: | 30.08.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/35] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP1362890 | Date: | 28.09.2016 | Language: | DE | [2016/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.09.2002 | Classification | IPC: | C08L23/02, B32B1/08, B32B27/34, B32B27/32, F16L11/15, F16L11/11 | [2003/47] | CPC: |
F16L11/15 (EP,US);
B32B1/08 (EP,KR,US);
B32B27/32 (EP,US);
B32B27/34 (EP,US);
C08L23/10 (EP,US);
F16L11/118 (EP,US);
B82Y40/00 (KR);
C08L2205/08 (EP,US);
C08L2312/00 (EP,US);
C08L51/06 (EP,US);
C08L53/02 (EP,US);
C08L77/00 (EP,US);
Y10T428/1352 (EP,US);
Y10T428/1379 (EP,US);
Y10T428/1386 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C08L23/10, C08L2666/02 (EP,US);
C08L23/10, C08L2666/20 (US,EP);
C08L23/10, C08L2666/24 (US,EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2016/39] |
Former [2004/33] | DE, FR, GB, IT | ||
Former [2003/47] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Gewellter Mehrschicht-Polymer-Schlauch- oder Rohrleitung mit reduzierter Längenänderung | [2003/47] | English: | Corrugated polymeric tubing or conduit having reduced change in length | [2003/47] | French: | Tube polymère ondulé ou conduit à variation de longueur réduite | [2003/47] | Examination procedure | 25.03.2003 | Examination requested [2003/47] | 10.07.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.10.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.04.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.05.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.05.2004 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 11.10.2004 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, GR, IE, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | 08.02.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.05.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 04.05.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
30.05.2007
07.06.2007
ADMISSIBLE Evonik Degussa GmbH Rellinghauser Strasse 1-11 45128 Essen / DE Opponent's representative f & e patent, et al, et al Braunsberger Feld 29 51429 Bergisch Gladbach / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/23] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
30.05.2007
07.06.2007
ADMISSIBLE Evonik Degussa GmbH Rellinghauser Strasse 1-11 45128 Essen / DE Opponent's representative polypatent BGL, et al, et al Braunsberger Feld 29 51429 Bergisch Gladbach / DE | ||
Former [2009/14] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
30.05.2007
07.06.2007
ADMISSIBLE Evonik Degussa GmbH Rellinghauser Strasse 1-11 45128 Essen / DE Opponent's representative Herz, Sabine, et al, et al Sternagel, Fleischer, Godemeyer & Partner Polypatent Braunsberger Feld 29 D-51429 Bergisch Gladbach / DE | ||
Former [2008/51] | |||
Opponent(s) |
deleted | ||
Former [2007/28] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
30.05.2007
07.06.2007
ADMISSIBLE Degussa GmbH Bennigsenplatz 1 40474 Düsseldorf / DE Opponent's representative Herz, Sabine, et al, et al Sternagel, Fleischer, Godemeyer & Partner Polypatent Braunsberger Feld 29 D-51429 Bergisch Gladbach / DE | 06.07.2007 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 02.10.2007 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 01.03.2011 | Date of oral proceedings | 21.03.2011 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 04.05.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M04) | 12.05.2015 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 22.09.2015 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 13.11.2015 | 28.09.2015 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 08.10.2015 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 13.11.2015 | Date of oral proceedings | 31.05.2016 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 15.08.2016 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Appeal following opposition | 30.05.2011 | Appeal received No. T1229/11 | 28.07.2011 | Statement of grounds filed | 02.12.2014 | Result of appeal procedure: maintenance in amended form | 02.12.2014 | Date of oral proceedings | 09.12.2014 | Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 06.07.2004 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 06.07.2004 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 06.07.2004 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 06.07.2004 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 06.07.2004 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 06.07.2004 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 06.07.2004 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 06.07.2004 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 06.07.2004 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 06.07.2004 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 06.07.2004 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 06.07.2004 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 06.07.2004 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 06.07.2004 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 06.07.2004 | TR   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | deleted | [2008/04] |
Former [2007/37] | IT | 30.08.2006 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0656388 (ATOCHEM ELF SA [FR]) [A] 1,3-5,10,12 * page 3, lines 44-59 - page 4, lines 53-57; claims 1-4,8; table 1 *; | [DXYA]EP0671582 (INVENTA AG [CH]) [DX] 1-3,5,6,11,12 * column 2, lines 19-31; figure -; claims 1-3,8-13,16,19 * [Y] 1,9 [A] 8; | [DXYA]DE4428236 (RASMUSSEN GMBH [DE]) [DX] 1-3,5,12 * column 1, lines 19-22,51-53 - column 2, lines 6-11; claim 1 * [Y] 1,9 [A] 6; | [DYA]DE4432584 (INVENTA AG [CH]) [DY] 1,9 * page 3, lines 60-67; figure -; claims 1,10-12,16,18-20,29-31 * [A] 1,2,5,6,11,12; | [DA]US6005052 (VENKATASWAMY KRISHNA [US], et al) [DA] 1,3,4,10* claims 1,7,8,14 *; | [DX]FR2802274 (NOBEL PLASTIQUES [FR]) [DX] 1,3,5 * page 3, lines 30-32; claims 1,2 * | by applicant | GB1209569 | GB1220975 | EP0368096 | US5191916 | DE4321575 | EP0671582 | DE4432584 | EP0745898 | WO9739270 | EP0863351 | Opposition | US3651014 | US4957968 | EP0569681 | EP0601295 | EP0679826 | US5637407 | US5985392 | EP1039199 | US6207758 | US6217961 | DE10116427 | WO0233303 | - S. ABDOU-SABET ET AL., Thermoplastic Elastomers Ullmann's Encyclpedia of Industrial Chemistry, WEINHEIM, WILEY-VCH, (1998), vol. 6, pages 1 - 56 | - D. THERADINGHAM ET A., Rubber 3. Synthetic 7 Thermoplastic Elastomers Ullmann's Encyclopedia of Industrial Chemistry, WEINHEIM, WILEY-VCH, (1998), vol. 6, pages 1 - 2 | - "Thermoplastische Elastomere" in: "CD Römpp Chemie Lexikon - Version 1.0", 1995,Georg Thieme Verlag |