EP1275978 - RPC circuit for continuous wave radar [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.08.2006 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.08.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 13.09.2006 [2006/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states EADS Deutschland GmbH 81663 München / DE | [2003/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Solbach, Klaus, Prof. Dr. Winkhauser Weg 144 45473 Mühlheim / DE | [2003/03] | Representative(s) | Meel, Thomas c/o Dornier GmbH Patentabteilung 88039 Friedrichshafen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/03] | Meel, Thomas Patentassessor, c/o Dornier GmbH L H G 88039 Friedrichshafen / DE | Application number, filing date | 02010394.1 | 08.05.2002 | [2003/03] | Priority number, date | DE2001134386 | 14.07.2001 Original published format: DE 10134386 | [2003/03] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1275978 | Date: | 15.01.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/03] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1275978 | Date: | 14.01.2004 | [2004/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1275978 | Date: | 05.10.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.11.2003 | Classification | IPC: | G01S13/34, G01S7/35, G01S7/03 | [2003/03] | CPC: |
G01S13/34 (EP,US);
G01S7/038 (EP,US);
G01S7/352 (EP,US);
G01S7/358 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [2004/41] |
Former [2003/03] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | RPC-Schaltung für Dauerstrichradar | [2003/03] | English: | RPC circuit for continuous wave radar | [2003/03] | French: | Circuit RPC pour radar à onde continue | [2003/03] | Examination procedure | 06.05.2004 | Examination requested [2004/28] | 20.04.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.05.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 06.05.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.07.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP1046926 (DAIMLER CHRYSLER AG [DE]) [A] 1-14 * figure 1 * * column 3, line 38 - column 4, line 29 *; | [A]US3233188 (STONELAKE DENNIS A) [A] 1-7 * figure 1 * * column 2, line 30 - line 44 * | [A] - BEASLEY P D L ET AL, "Solving the problems of a single antenna frequency modulated CW radar", IEEE INTERNATIONAL RADAR CONFERENCE, (19900507), pages 391 - 395, XP010007512 [A] 1-14 * page 391 - page 392 * | [A] - QI JIMING ET AL, "Development of a 3 cm band reflected power canceller", 2001 CIE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON RADAR PROCEEDINGS (CAT NO.01TH8559), 2001 CIE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON RADAR PROCEEDINGS, BEIJING, CHINA, 15-18 OCT. 2001, 2001, Piscataway, NJ, USA, IEEE, USA, ISBN 0-7803-7000-7, pages 1098 - 1102, XP002261033 [A] 1-14 * abstract * * figure 3 * * paragraph [0002] * |