EP1260762 - Projection module for vehicle headlamp [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.10.2009 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.03.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 06.04.2011 [2011/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hella KGaA Hueck & Co. Rixbecker Strasse 75 59552 Lippstadt / DE | [2004/48] |
Former [2002/48] | For all designated states Hella KG Hueck & Co. Rixbecker Strasse 75 59552 Lippstadt / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Brummel, Reinhold Im Soesttal 58 59609 Anröchte / DE | 02 /
Korff, Detlef Holunderweg 15 59557 Lippstadt / DE | 03 /
Mücke, Achim Grüner Weg 23 a 59556 Lippstadt / DE | 04 /
Buchhorn, Axel Mozartweg 2 59505 Bad Sassendorf / DE | [2002/48] | Application number, filing date | 02010545.8 | 10.05.2002 | [2002/48] | Priority number, date | DE2001125462 | 25.05.2001 Original published format: DE 10125462 | [2002/48] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1260762 | Date: | 27.11.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/48] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1260762 | Date: | 17.03.2004 | [2004/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1260762 | Date: | 26.11.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.02.2004 | Classification | IPC: | F21V14/08 | [2002/48] | CPC: |
F21S41/686 (EP);
F21S41/43 (EP);
F21S41/62 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, DE, ES, FR, IT [2004/50] |
Former [2002/48] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Projektionsmodul für einen Fahrzeugscheinwerfer | [2002/48] | English: | Projection module for vehicle headlamp | [2002/48] | French: | Module de projection pour projecteur de véhicule | [2002/48] | Examination procedure | 17.09.2004 | Examination requested [2004/47] | 18.09.2004 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 13.01.2005 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) BE, CH, CY, DK, FI, GB, GR, IE, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | 20.06.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.10.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 08.10.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.08.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 26.10.2004 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 26.10.2004 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 26.10.2004 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 26.10.2004 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 26.10.2004 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 26.10.2004 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 26.10.2004 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 26.10.2004 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 26.10.2004 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 26.10.2004 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 26.10.2004 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 26.10.2004 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 26.10.2004 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 26.10.2004 | TR   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 26.11.2008 | ES | 08.03.2009 | [2011/14] |
Former [2009/20] | ES | 08.03.2009 | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]DE19858225 (HELLA KG HUECK &CO.) [AD] 1 * column 3, line 43 - line 54 * * figure 1 *; | [A]DE4233032 (HELLA KG HUECK & CO [DE]) [A] 1 * column 5, line 45 - line 64 * * figures 2,6 *; | [AD]DE4407108 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [AD] 1* column 3, line 53 - column 4, line 50; figures 1-3 *; | [A]DE19643945 (ORTH ARMIN DIPL ING FH [DE]) [A] 1 * figure 3; claim 2 *; | [AD]DE19908642 (HELLA KG HUECK & CO [DE]) [AD] 1 * column 3, line 29 - line 34 * * figures 2,4 * | by applicant | DE4407108 | DE19858225 | DE19908642 |