EP1265019 - Supporting tube and connector assembly [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.06.2006 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.09.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 14.10.2009 [2009/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states VIEGA GmbH & Co. KG Ennester Weg 9 57439 Attendorn / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/30] | For all designated states VIEGA GmbH & Co. KG. Ennester Weg 9 57439 Attendorn / DE | ||
Former [2002/50] | For all designated states Franz Viegener II GmbH & Co. KG. Ennester Weg 9 57439 Attendorn / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Viegener, Walter Biekhoferstrasse 26 57439 Attendorn / DE | [2002/50] | Representative(s) | Meyer, Hans-Joachim, et al Cohausz & Florack Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Bleichstrasse 14 40211 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/40] | Meyer, Hans-Joachim, et al COHAUSZ & FLORACK Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Bleichstrasse 14 40211 Düsseldorf / DE | ||
Former [2002/50] | Dantz, Jan Henning, et al Loesenbeck Stracke Specht Dantz Patentanwälte Jöllenbecker Strasse 164 33613 Bielefeld / DE | Application number, filing date | 02010902.1 | 16.05.2002 | [2002/50] | Priority number, date | DE2001209548U | 07.06.2001 Original published format: DE 20109548 U | [2002/50] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1265019 | Date: | 11.12.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1265019 | Date: | 24.08.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.08.2002 | Classification | IPC: | F16L13/14 | [2002/50] | CPC: |
F16L13/148 (EP);
F16L13/143 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/50] | Title | German: | Stützrohr und Verbindungsanordnung | [2002/50] | English: | Supporting tube and connector assembly | [2002/50] | French: | Tube de support et assemblage de connection | [2002/50] | Examination procedure | 15.11.2002 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.11.2002 | Examination requested [2003/03] | 24.06.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.10.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.04.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.06.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 27.06.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.05.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | TR | 24.08.2005 | CY | 16.05.2006 | IE | 16.05.2006 | LU | 16.05.2006 | [2009/42] |
Former [2008/37] | CY | 16.05.2006 | |
IE | 16.05.2006 | ||
LU | 16.05.2006 | ||
Former [2007/37] | CY | 16.05.2006 | |
IE | 16.05.2006 | ||
Former [2007/25] | IE | 16.05.2006 | Documents cited: | Search | [XYA]DE1243477 (RESISTOFLEX CORP) [X] 1,4,6,8,9 * figures 1,2 * * column 3, line 61 - line 68 * [Y] 5,10 [A] 2,3,7; | [XY]DE4444119 (RITZ REINERT GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,9 * abstract * * column 4, line 55 - line 61 *[Y] 5,10 |