EP1260979 - Information playback apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 05.10.2007 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.10.2007 | Withdrawal of application | published on 07.11.2007 [2007/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Pioneer Corporation 4-1, Meguro 1-chome Meguro-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2002/48] | For all designated states Pioneer Corporation 4-1 Meguro 1-chome Meguro-ku, Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yamada, Yoichi c/o Tokorozawa Koujou, 2610, Hanazono, 4-chome Tokorozawa-shi, Saitama-ken 359-8522 / JP | 02 /
Kimura, Tomohiko c/o Tokorozawa Koujou, 2610, Hanazono, 4-chome Tokorozawa-shi, Saitama-ken 359-8522 / JP | 03 /
Sakata, Koichiro c/o Tokorozawa Koujou, 2610, Hanazono, 4-chome Tokorozawa-shi, Saitama-ken 359-8522 / JP | 04 /
Funada, Takeaki c/o Tokorozawa Koujou, 2610, Hanazono, 4-chome Tokorozawa-shi, Saitama-ken 359-8522 / JP | 05 /
Isobe, Hiroyuki c/o Tokorozawa Koujou, 2610, Hanazono, 4-chome Tokorozawa-shi, Saitama-ken 359-8522 / JP | 06 /
Takagaki, Junichi c/o Tokorozawa Koujou, 2610, Hanazono, 4-chome Tokorozawa-shi, Saitama-ken 359-8522 / JP | 07 /
Kikuchi, Tetsuya c/o Tokorozawa Koujou, 2610, Hanazono, 4-chome Tokorozawa-shi, Saitama-ken 359-8522 / JP | 08 /
Inoshita, Gen Oomori Kuojou, 15-5, Oomorinishi 4-chome, Ooata-ku Tokyo 143-8564 / JP | 09 /
Atsumi, Kou Oomori Kuojou, 15-5, Oomorinishi 4-chome, Ooata-ku Tokyo 143-8564 / JP | [2002/48] | Representative(s) | Popp, Eugen, et al Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Widenmayerstraße 47 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/48] | Popp, Eugen, Dr., et al MEISSNER, BOLTE & PARTNER Widenmayerstrasse 48 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02011303.1 | 22.05.2002 | [2002/48] | Priority number, date | JP20010152228 | 22.05.2001 Original published format: JP 2001152228 | [2002/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1260979 | Date: | 27.11.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/48] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1260979 | Date: | 23.04.2003 | [2003/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.03.2003 | Classification | IPC: | G11B19/00, G10H1/00 | [2002/48] | CPC: |
G11B19/00 (EP,US);
G10H1/0091 (EP,US);
G10H1/055 (EP,US);
G10H1/40 (EP,US);
G11B27/005 (EP,US);
G10H2210/241 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2004/03] |
Former [2002/48] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Informationswiedergabegerät | [2002/48] | English: | Information playback apparatus | [2002/48] | French: | Appareil de reproduction d'informations | [2002/48] | Examination procedure | 01.07.2003 | Examination requested [2003/35] | 03.06.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.12.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.09.2007 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2007/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPS5567967 ; | [X]JPH02304760 ; | [X]JPH0689501 ; | [X]JP2000182318 ; | [X]US5350882 (KOGUCHI SATORU [JP], et al) [X] 1,2,4,5 * abstract * * column 5, line 55 - line 61 *; | [X]WO9701168 (RICKLI ANDRE [CH]) [X] 1,2,4,5 * the whole document *; | [X]DE19608958 (PRETZ RALF [DE], et al) [X] 1,2,4,5 * the whole document *; | [X]WO0021090 (BORIEUX PHILIPPE [FR]) [X] 1,2,4,5 * the whole document *; | [X]EP0999553 (CORTELLESI ALESSANDRO [IT]) [X] 1,2,4,5 * the whole document * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19800808), vol. 004, no. 110, Database accession no. (P - 022), & JP55067967 A 19800522 (NIPPON HAMONDO KK) [X] 1,2 * abstract * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19910304), vol. 015, no. 088, Database accession no. (P - 1174), & JP02304760 A 19901218 (HITACHI LTD;OTHERS: 01) [X] 1,2 * abstract * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19940704), vol. 018, no. 353, Database accession no. (P - 1764), & JP06089501 A 19940329 (CASIO COMPUT CO LTD) [X] 1,2,4,5 * abstract * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20001013), vol. 2000, no. 09, & JP2000182318 A 20000630 (NIPPON COLUMBIA CO LTD) [X] 1,2,4,5 * abstract * |