EP1260359 - Method for manufacturing a laminated board [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.10.2006 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.10.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 15.11.2006 [2006/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SUMITOMO BAKELITE CO., LTD. 5-8, Higashi-Shinagawa 2-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 140-0002 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2005/49] | For all designated states SUMITOMO BAKELITE CO., LTD. 5-8, Higashi-Shinagawa 2-chome, Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 140-0002 / JP | ||
Former [2002/48] | For all designated states SUMITOMO BAKELITE CO., LTD. 5-8, Higashi-Shinagawa 2-chome, Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 140-0002 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ilda, Takahisa, Sumitomo Bakelite Co. Ltd. 5-8, Higashi-shinagawa 2-chome Shinagawa-ku, Tokyo 140-0002 / JP | [2002/48] | Representative(s) | Solf, Alexander Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Dr. Solf & Zapf Candidplatz 15 81543 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/48] | Solf, Alexander, Dr. Patentanwälte Dr. Solf & Zapf Candidplatz 15 81543 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02011363.5 | 23.05.2002 | [2002/48] | Priority number, date | JP20010155595 | 24.05.2001 Original published format: JP 2001155595 | [2002/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1260359 | Date: | 27.11.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/48] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1260359 | Date: | 26.11.2003 | [2003/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1260359 | Date: | 07.12.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.10.2003 | Classification | IPC: | B32B31/08, B32B31/20 | [2002/48] | CPC: |
B32B15/14 (EP,US);
B32B15/08 (KR);
B32B15/04 (EP,US);
B32B15/20 (US);
B32B27/08 (US);
B32B37/203 (EP,US);
B32B7/14 (US);
H05K3/022 (EP,US);
H05K3/386 (EP,US);
B32B2038/0076 (EP,US);
B32B2305/076 (EP,US);
B32B2309/02 (EP,US);
B32B2309/12 (EP,US);
B32B2311/00 (EP,US);
B32B2311/12 (US);
B32B2398/10 (EP,US);
B32B2457/08 (EP,US);
B32B38/0036 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2004/34] |
Former [2002/48] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung einer mehrschichtigen Platte | [2002/48] | English: | Method for manufacturing a laminated board | [2002/48] | French: | Procédé de fabrication d'une plaque stratifiée | [2002/48] | Examination procedure | 18.03.2004 | Examination requested [2004/21] | 21.04.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.10.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.11.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.03.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.06.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.10.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 11.10.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP05007899.7 / EP1555121 | Opposition(s) | 08.09.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US4087300 (ADLER EDWARD) [X] 1,8,10,13 * column 7, lines 29-54; figure 1 * * column 5, line 52 - column 6, line 69 * [A] 2-7,9,11-17; | [XA]GB2057351 (KOLLMORGEN TECH CORP) [X] 1,8,13 * page 1, line 25 - page 7, line 37; figure 4 * * page 3, line 37 - page 4, line 43 * [A] 2-7,9-12,14-17; | [XA]EP0130312 (SINTER LTD [GB]) [X] 1-4,8,12,17 * page 7, lines 5-32 * * page 4, lines 17-32 * * page 6, lines 5-19 - line 15 * [A] 5-7,9-11,13-16; | [XA]US4557784 (UEKITA MASAKAZU [JP], et al) [X] 1,8,13 * page 7, lines 31-42; figure 4 * * page 1, line 30 - page 2, line 29 * [A] 2-7,9-12,14-17; | [XA]US4659425 (EGGERS EUGENE A [US], et al) [X] 1,13 * column 2, line 44 - column 6, line 30; figure 1 * [A] 2-12,14-17; | [A]US5919525 (APPELT BERND KARL [US], et al) [A] 5,6* column 5, line 47 - column 9, line 67 * |