EP1260328 - Cutting machine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.06.2005 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.06.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 20.07.2005 [2005/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ISP Systems S.r.l. Via F.lli Rosselli, 46 61100 Pesaro / IT | [2002/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Pritelli, Giuseppe Via C. Marx 7 47033 Cattolica / IT | [2002/48] | Representative(s) | Cerbaro, Elena, et al Studio Torta S.p.A. Via Viotti, 9 10121 Torino / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2002/48] | Cerbaro, Elena, Dr., et al STUDIO TORTA S.r.l., Via Viotti, 9 10121 Torino / IT | Application number, filing date | 02011453.4 | 24.05.2002 | [2002/48] | Priority number, date | IT2001TO00500 | 25.05.2001 Original published format: IT TO20010500 | [2002/48] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1260328 | Date: | 27.11.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/48] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1260328 | Date: | 28.05.2003 | [2003/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.04.2003 | Classification | IPC: | B27B5/065, B27B31/00, B23D47/04, B27B31/06 | [2003/22] | CPC: |
B27B31/006 (EP);
B23D47/042 (EP);
B27B5/065 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2002/48] | B27B5/065, B27B31/00, B23D47/04 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/48] | Title | German: | Trennmaschine | [2002/48] | English: | Cutting machine | [2002/48] | French: | Machine à découper | [2002/48] | Examination procedure | 12.11.2003 | Examination requested [2004/02] | 01.12.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/29] | 10.01.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2005/29] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2004 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE1080287 (MEYER & SCHWABEDISSEN F) [A] 1-6 * column 1, line 36 - column 2, line 34 * * figure - *; | [A]DE6606703U (GUENTHER PAPENMEIER [DE]) [A] 1-6* the whole document *; | [XA]GB1285739 (BENUZZI GINO [IT]) [X] 1,2 * page 4, column R, line 124 - page 5, column R, line 85 * * figures 5,8,10,11 * [A] 3; | [A]DE1628923 (WEHNER ELIMAR) [A] 1-6 * the whole document *; | [XA]GB1426623 (GIBEN IMPIANTI SPA) [X] 1,2 * page 6, column L, line 25 - line 53 * * figures 1,3 * [A] 3; | [XA]US4065991 (BENUZZI GINO) [X] 1-3 * column 1, line 49 - column 3, line 23 * * figure - * [A] 4 |