EP1270981 - Wheel hub brake for work machine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.02.2005 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.02.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 30.03.2005 [2005/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states STILL GmbH Berzeliusstrasse 10 22113 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/01] | For all designated states STILL GMBH Berzeliusstrasse 10 D-22113 Hamburg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schröder, Werner-Georg Landwehrstrasse 38 63762 Grossostheim / DE | 02 /
Raab, Stephan Schulstrasse 13 83370 Seeon / DE | [2003/01] | Representative(s) | Lang, Michael Linde AG Zentrale Patentabteilung D-82049 Höllriegelskreuth / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/01] | Lang, Michael Linde AG Zentrale Patentabteilung 82049 Höllriegelskreuth / DE | Application number, filing date | 02011460.9 | 24.05.2002 | [2003/01] | Priority number, date | DE2001130930 | 27.06.2001 Original published format: DE 10130930 | [2003/01] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1270981 | Date: | 02.01.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/01] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1270981 | Date: | 02.01.2004 | [2004/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.11.2003 | Classification | IPC: | F16D55/40 | [2003/01] | CPC: |
F16D59/02 (EP);
F16D55/36 (EP);
F16D65/186 (EP);
F16D2121/02 (EP);
F16D2121/12 (EP);
F16D2121/14 (EP);
F16D2123/00 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2004/39] |
Former [2003/01] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Radnabenbremse für eine Arbeitsmaschine | [2003/01] | English: | Wheel hub brake for work machine | [2003/01] | French: | Frein sur moyeu pour machine opératrice | [2003/01] | Examination procedure | 03.07.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/13] | 27.10.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2005/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 10.08.2004 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 10.08.2004 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 10.08.2004 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 10.08.2004 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 10.08.2004 | M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US3770085 (COTTINGHAM E) [X] 1 * abstract *; | [X]US4172511 (KHUNTIA NATABARA [US], et al) [X] 1-4,6-9,12 * column 1, line 22 - column 2, line 42; figure 2 *; | [X]EP0512252 (CLARK EQUIPMENT CO [US]) [X] 1-4,6,8,12 * column 6, line 57 - column 8, line 26; figures 1,2 *; | [X]DE19646010 (STILL GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-3,6-8,12 * the whole document *; | [X]US6089357 (JACKSON DAVID C [US], et al) [X] 1-4,6-9,12 * abstract *; | [X]WO0159320 (MICO INC [US]) [X] 1* abstract * |