EP1262817 - Photochromic gyricon display [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.06.2005 Database last updated on 21.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2006 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 09.08.2006 [2006/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Xerox Corporation Patent Department Xerox Square - 20 A 100 Clinton Avenue South Rochester, NY 14644 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2002/49] | For all designated states Xerox Corporation Patent Department, Xerox Square - 20 A, 100 Clinton Avenue South Rochester, New York 14644 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Foucher, Daniel A. 768 Shaw Street Toronto, Ontario M6G 3M1 / CA | 02 /
Patel, Raj D. 2051 Pen Street Oakville, Ontario L6H 3L2 / CA | 03 /
Chopra, Naveen 444 Watson Avenue, Apt. 1 Oakville, Ontario L6J 3W2 / CA | 04 /
Kazmaier, Peter M. 2421 Counsil Ring Road Mississauga, Ontario L5L 1E5 / CA | 05 /
Buncel, Erwin 16 Hatter Street Kingston, Ontario K7M 2L5 / CA | 06 /
Wojtyk, James 33 Patterson Street, Apt. 1 Ottawa, Ontario K1S 1X9 / CA | [2002/49] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/49] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02011484.9 | 24.05.2002 | [2002/49] | Priority number, date | US20010864386 | 24.05.2001 Original published format: US 864386 | [2002/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1262817 | Date: | 04.12.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1262817 | Date: | 04.08.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.09.2002 | Classification | IPC: | G02F1/167, C07D491/10 | [2002/49] | CPC: |
G02B26/026 (EP,US);
C07D491/10 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2003/35] |
Former [2002/49] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Photochrome Gyriconanzeigevorrichtung | [2002/49] | English: | Photochromic gyricon display | [2002/49] | French: | Dispositif d'affichage photochrome du type gyricon | [2002/49] | Examination procedure | 04.06.2003 | Examination requested [2003/32] | 11.11.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.03.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 22.03.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.05.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 04.08.2004 | [2006/32] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4026869 (EVENS GEORGES GERARD, et al) [A] 1* column 2, line 53 - column 3, line 30 *; | [A]US6358655 (FOUCHER DANIEL A [US], et al) [A] 1 * column 1, line 3 - column 2, line 58 * |