EP1364968 - Diagnostics and therapeutics for diseases associated with arginine vasopressin receptor 1 (AVPR1) [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.11.2006 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.11.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.12.2006 [2006/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bayer HealthCare AG 51368 Leverkusen / DE | [2004/01] |
Former [2003/48] | For all designated states Bayer Aktiengesellschaft 51368 Leverkusen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Golz, Stefan, Dr. Bückmannmühle 46 45329 Essen / DE | 02 /
Brüggemeier, Ulf, Dr. Leysiefen 20 42799 Leichlingen / DE | 03 /
Geerts, Andreas Schuckertstrasse 29 42113 Wuppertal / DE | 04 /
Thiele, Ralf, Dr. Ebbinghauser Strasse 13 33178 Borchen / DE | [2003/48] | Application number, filing date | 02011530.9 | 23.05.2002 | [2003/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1364968 | Date: | 26.11.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.11.2002 | Classification | IPC: | C07K14/72 | [2003/48] | CPC: |
C07K14/705 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/48] | Title | German: | Diagnostika und Therapeutika für Krankheiten, die mit Arginin-Vasopressin-Rezeptor 1 (AVPR1) assoziiert sind | [2003/48] | English: | Diagnostics and therapeutics for diseases associated with arginine vasopressin receptor 1 (AVPR1) | [2003/48] | French: | Diagnostic et traitement des maladies associées au récepteur 1 d'arginine-vasopressine (AVPR1) | [2003/48] | Examination procedure | 26.05.2004 | Examination requested [2004/31] | 08.02.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.06.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/49] | 21.07.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2006/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPH0880193 ; | [X]WO0043398 (ORTHO MCNEIL PHARM INC [US]) [X] 1,4-6,8-10,19-21,24-26 * abstract, Example 50, claims 1 - 18 *; | [X]WO0177172 (ARENA PHARM INC [US], et al) [X] 1-6,8-10 * p. 1, lines 8 - 13, p. 12, table B, p. 19, line 4 - p. 22, line 4, p. 33, lin1 - p. 34, line 3, p. 66, Seq Id Nos. 452 & 453, Examples 3, 4, , claims 1 and 16 *; | [X]WO0202531 (ORTHO MCNEIL PHARM INC [US]) [X] 1-6,8-10,19-21,24-26 * abstract, example 49, tables I - V *; | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19960731), vol. 1996, no. 07, & JP08080193 A 19960326 (OTSUKA PHARMACEUT CO LTD) [X] 1-26 * abstract * * Sequences p. 7 - p. 10 * | [X] - YAMAMURA Y ET AL, "OPC-21268 AN ORALLY EFFECTIVE NONPEPTIDE VASOPRESSIN V1 RECEPTOR ANTAGONIST", SCIENCE (WASHINGTON D C), (1991), vol. 252, no. 5005, ISSN 0036-8075, pages 572 - 574, XP001118282 [X] 1,3,5,6,8-10,19-21,24-26 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.1850553 | [X] - HOWL JOHN ET AL, "Pharmacological characterization of linear analogues of vasopressin generated by the systematic substitution of positions 1 and 6 by L-amino acids.", BIOCHEMICAL PHARMACOLOGY, (1994), vol. 47, no. 9, ISSN 0006-2952, pages 1497 - 1501, XP001107126 [X] 1-10,19-21,24-26 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0006-2952(94)90523-1 | [A] - THIBONNNIER M ET AL, "STRUCTURE, SEQUENCE, EXPRESSION, AND CHROMOSOMAL LOCALIZATION OF THE HUMAN V1A VASOPRESSIN RECEPTOR GENE", GENOMICS, ACADEMIC PRESS, SAN DIEGO, US, (1996), vol. 31, no. 3, ISSN 0888-7543, pages 327 - 334, XP000979403 [A] 1-26 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1006/geno.1996.0055 | [A] - ARNALDI GIORGIO ET AL, "Variable expression of the V1 vasopressin receptor modulates the phenotypic response of steroid-secreting adrenocortical tumors.", JOURNAL OF CLINICAL ENDOCRINOLOGY & METABOLISM, (199806), vol. 83, no. 6, ISSN 0021-972X, pages 2029 - 2035, XP001118067 [A] 1-26 * abstract, p. 2030, col. 1, line 51 - p. 2031, col. 1, line 42, * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1210/jc.83.6.2029 |