EP1270689 - Aqueous powder coating dispersions containing effect pigments [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.05.2004 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.05.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 14.07.2004 [2004/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Merck Patent GmbH Frankfurter Strasse 250 64293 Darmstadt / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/01] | For all designated states MERCK PATENT GmbH Frankfurter Strasse 250 64293 Darmstadt / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kieser, Manfred, Dr. Händelstrasse 39 64291 Darmstadt / DE | 02 /
Hennemann, Alfred Am Sonnenberg 23 64753 Brombachtal / DE | [2003/01] | Application number, filing date | 02011549.9 | 24.05.2002 | [2003/01] | Priority number, date | DE2001129506 | 19.06.2001 Original published format: DE 10129506 | [2003/01] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1270689 | Date: | 02.01.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.10.2002 | Classification | IPC: | C09D5/02, C09D5/36 | [2003/01] | CPC: |
C09D5/02 (EP,KR,US);
C09D5/36 (EP,US);
Y10T428/2971 (EP,US);
Y10T428/2973 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/01] | Title | German: | Effektpigmenthaltige wässrige Pulverlackdispersionen | [2003/01] | English: | Aqueous powder coating dispersions containing effect pigments | [2003/01] | French: | Dispersion aqueuse de revêtement en poudre contenant des pigments à effet | [2003/01] | Examination procedure | 24.05.2002 | Examination requested [2003/01] | 02.05.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.11.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/29] | 14.01.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2004/29] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4137349 (SAKAKIBARA TAKAO, et al) [X] 1-8 * column 3, line 38 - line 43 * * column 4, line 16 - line 30 * * column 9, line 35 - line 61 * * example 3 *; | [X]WO9901499 (BASF COATINGS AG [DE], et al) [X] 1-8 * page 7, line 29 - page 8, line 14 * * page 11, line 2 - line 24 * * page 24, line 1 - line 6 * * page 25, line 25 - line 27 * * page 26, line 4 - line 21 **Beispiel*; | [PX]WO0192429 (BASF COATINGS AG [DE], et al) [PX] 1-8 * page 6, line 25 - line 28 * * page 8, line 21 - page 9, line 2 * * page 13, line 14 - line 18 * * page 14, line 16 - line 20 * * page 42, line 10 - line 20 * * example 1 * |