EP1262783 - An apparatus, a method for testing an electrical wiring system, a computer program for testing an electrical wiring system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.06.2005 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.08.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 12.09.2007 [2007/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sumitomo Wiring Systems, Ltd. 1-14, Nishisuehiro-cho Yokkaichi-city Mie 510-8503 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2003/47] | For all designated states Sumitomo Wiring Systems, Ltd. 1-14, Nishisuehiro-cho Yokkaichi-City, Mie, 510-8503 / JP | ||
Former [2002/49] | For all designated states Sumitomo Wiring Systems, Ltd. 1-14, Nishisuehiro-cho Yokkaichi-City, Mie, 510-8503 / JP | ||
For all designated states Holon Corporation 10-15, 6-chome, Ogaki Ritto-City, Shiga-pref 520-3024 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Taniguchi, Yoshikazu Sumitomo Wiring Sys., Ltd., 1-14, Nishisuehiro-cho Yokkaichi-city, Mie 510-8503 / JP | 02 /
Mori, Setsurou Holon Corporation, 10-15, 6-chome, Ogaki Ritto-city, Shiga-pref. 520-3024 / JP | [2002/49] | Representative(s) | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/49] | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte Grafinger Strasse 2 81671 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02011563.0 | 24.05.2002 | [2002/49] | Priority number, date | JP20010163088 | 30.05.2001 Original published format: JP 2001163088 | [2002/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1262783 | Date: | 04.12.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1262783 | Date: | 28.07.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.09.2002 | Classification | IPC: | G01R31/02 | [2002/49] | CPC: |
G01R31/088 (EP,US);
G01R31/58 (EP,US);
G01R31/66 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2003/35] |
Former [2002/49] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Vorrichtung und Methode zum Testen eines elektrischen Kabelbaumsystems, Computer-Programm zum Testen eines elektrischen Kabelbaumsystems | [2002/49] | English: | An apparatus, a method for testing an electrical wiring system, a computer program for testing an electrical wiring system | [2002/49] | French: | Dispositif et procédé pour tester un système de câblage électrique, logiciel pour tester un système de câblage électrique | [2002/49] | Examination procedure | 27.03.2003 | Examination requested [2003/21] | 22.04.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.08.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.11.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.04.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 01.04.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.04.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 28.07.2004 | IT | 28.07.2004 | [2007/37] |
Former [2006/32] | FR | 28.07.2004 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4224690 (ROCKWELL KENNETH N) [X] 1-10 * abstract * * column 4, line 34 - column 12, line 66 *; | [XA]US4597072 (SOMLAI LAJOS [HU], et al) [X] 1,2,4,5 * abstract * * column 4, line 25 - column 9, line 50 * [A] 3,6-10; | [XA]US4689551 (RYAN HAROLD [US], et al) [X] 1,2,4,5 * abstract * * column 2, line 51 - column 5, line 2 *[A] 3,6-10; | [X]US5155440 (HUANG GEORGE S K [US]) [X] 1-10 * abstract * * column 4, line 50 - column 7, line 16 * |