EP1263186 - Method of establishing a secure tunnel through a proxy server between a user device and a secure server [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.11.2005 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.11.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.01.2006 [2006/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Openwave Systems Inc. 1400 Seaport Boulevard Redwood City, CA 94063 / US | [2002/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
King, Peter F. 438 Magellan Avenue Half Moon Bay, CA 94019 / US | [2002/49] | Representative(s) | Jehle, Volker Armin Bosch Jehle Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Flüggenstrasse 13 80639 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/49] | Jehle, Volker Armin Bosch, Graf von Stosch, Jehle, Patentanwälte, Theatinerstrasse 8 80333 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02011758.6 | 27.05.2002 | [2002/49] | Priority number, date | US20010872997 | 31.05.2001 Original published format: US 872997 | [2002/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1263186 | Date: | 04.12.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/49] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1263186 | Date: | 06.10.2004 | [2004/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.08.2004 | Classification | IPC: | H04L29/06 | [2002/49] | CPC: |
H04L63/0281 (EP,US);
H04L63/029 (EP,US);
H04L63/067 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | [2005/26] |
Former [2002/49] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung eines sicheren Tunnels durch einen Proxyserver zwischen einem Benutzergerät und einem sicheren Server | [2002/49] | English: | Method of establishing a secure tunnel through a proxy server between a user device and a secure server | [2002/49] | French: | Méthode pour construire un tunnel sécurisé à travers un serveur proxy entre un dispositif d'utilisateur et un serveur sécurisé | [2002/49] | Examination procedure | 07.04.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/02] | 03.08.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2006/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 17.05.2005 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 17.05.2005 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 17.05.2005 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 17.05.2005 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 17.05.2005 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 17.05.2005 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 17.05.2005 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 17.05.2005 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 17.05.2005 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 17.05.2005 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 17.05.2005 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 17.05.2005 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 17.05.2005 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 17.05.2005 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 17.05.2005 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 17.05.2005 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 17.05.2005 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 17.05.2005 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 17.05.2005 | TR   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 17.05.2005 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2005 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X] - LUOTONEN A, "Tunneling TCP based protocols trough Web proxy servers", INTERNET-DRAFT, (199808), XP002275009 [X] 1-41 * the whole document * | [X] - KHARE R., "Upgrading to TLS within HTTP/1.1", NETWORK WORKING GROUP, (200005), XP015008600 [X] 1-41 * page 6, line 1 - page 7, line 34 * | [A] - STEVENS W.R., TCP/IP Illustrated, Volume 3, READING, MA, U.S.A., ADDISON WESLEY, (1996), XP002291458 [A] 1-41 * page 87, line 1 - page 90, line 12; figures 7.1-7.5 * | [A] - "WAP-219-TLS: WAP TLS Profile and Tunneling Specification", WIRELESS APPLICATION FORUM PROTOCOL LTD, (20010411), URL: www.wmlclub.com, XP002291457 [A] 1-41 * page 11, line 1 - line 14 * |