Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
21.12.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 23.01.2008 [2008/04] |
12.01.2007 | (Expected) grant | published on 14.02.2007 [2007/07] |
05.01.2007 | New entry: Payment of fee for grant | |
05.01.2007 | New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing | |
23.09.2006 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | |
03.08.2006 | New entry: Reply to examination report | |
30.05.2006 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | |
30.05.2006 | New entry: Reply to examination report | |
07.04.2006 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
06.04.2006 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | |
09.06.2005 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
08.06.2004 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
28.01.2004 | Deletion: Fee payment for extension state | |
28.01.2004 | Deletion: Withdrawal of extension state | |
26.09.2003 | Definitive list of designations | published on 12.11.2003 [2003/46] |
13.06.2003 | Change - extension states | |
13.06.2003 | Request for examination filed | published on 30.07.2003 [2003/31] |
03.04.2003 | Amendment by applicant | |
11.01.2003 | Publication of search report | published on 26.02.2003 [2003/09] |
25.10.2002 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 11.12.2002 [2002/50] |