Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE50209456D1 | 29.03.2007 | D1 | Priority number | Date | DE20109475 | 07.06.2001 | DE50209456 | 27.05.2002 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1265021 | Global Dossier | 14.02.2007 | B1 | EP1265021 | 26.02.2003 | A3 | EP1265021 | 11.12.2002 | A2 | Priority number | Date | DE20109475 | 07.06.2001 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE354051T | 15.03.2007 | T1 | Priority number | Date | DE20109475 | 07.06.2001 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CY1106461T | 25.01.2012 | T1 | Priority number | Date | DE20109475 | 07.06.2001 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CZ298485 | 17.10.2007 | B6 | CZ20021968 | 15.01.2003 | A3 | Priority number | Date | DE20109475 | 07.06.2001 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE20109475U | 17.10.2002 | U1 | Priority number | Date | DE20109475 | 07.06.2001 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DK1265021T | 11.06.2007 | T3 | Priority number | Date | DE20109475 | 07.06.2001 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2280452T | 16.09.2007 | T3 | Priority number | Date | DE20109475 | 07.06.2001 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | HUP0201919 | 28.08.2003 | A3 | HUP0201919 | 28.01.2003 | A2 | HU0201919D0 | 28.08.2002 | D0 | Priority number | Date | DE20109475 | 07.06.2001 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | PL354307 | 16.12.2002 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE20109475 | 07.06.2001 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | PT1265021E | 31.05.2007 | E | Priority number | Date | DE20109475 | 07.06.2001 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | SK285988B | 07.01.2008 | B6 | SK8052002 | 09.01.2003 | A3 | Priority number | Date | DE20109475 | 07.06.2001 |