blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1266995

EP1266995 - Calender [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  06.01.2006
Database last updated on 09.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip06.01.2006No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 22.02.2006  [2006/08]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Voith Paper Patent GmbH
Sankt Pöltener Strasse 43
89522 Heidenheim / DE
[2002/51]
Inventor(s)01 / Conrad, Hans-Rolf
Friedenstrasse 28
41539 Dormagen / DE
 [2002/51]
Representative(s)Knoblauch, Andreas
Patentanwälte Dr. Knoblauch PartGmbB
Reuterweg 51-53
60323 Frankfurt am Main / DE
[N/P]
Former [2002/51]Knoblauch, Andreas, Dr.-Ing.
Schlosserstrasse 23
60322 Frankfurt / DE
Application number, filing date02011792.528.05.2002
[2002/51]
Priority number, dateDE200112910216.06.2001         Original published format: DE 10129102
[2002/51]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1266995
Date:18.12.2002
Language:DE
[2002/51]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1266995
Date:23.07.2003
[2003/30]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1266995
Date:02.03.2005
Language:DE
[2005/09]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP11.06.2003
ClassificationIPC:D21G1/00
[2002/51]
CPC:
D21G1/00 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesDE,   FI,   SE [2004/16]
Former [2002/51]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
TitleGerman:Kalander[2002/51]
English:Calender[2002/51]
French:Calandre[2002/51]
Examination procedure21.06.2003Examination requested  [2003/35]
02.02.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
29.05.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.08.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
08.12.2004Fee for grant paid
08.12.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)05.12.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2006/08]
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.05.2004Renewal fee patent year 03
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[X]EP1092805  (KUESTERS EDUARD MASCHF [DE]) [X] 1,3-5 * figure - * * paragraph [0015] - paragraph [0016] * * paragraph [0028] - paragraph [0029] ** paragraph [0031] - paragraph [0032] *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.