EP1285992 - Device for treating a fibrous web [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.08.2008 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.08.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 03.09.2008 [2008/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Voith Patent GmbH St. Pöltener Str. 43 89522 Heidenheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/37] | For all designated states Voith Patent GmbH Sankt Pöltener Strasse 43 89522 Heidenheim / DE | ||
Former [2003/09] | For all designated states Voith Paper Patent GmbH Sankt Pöltener Strasse 43 89522 Heidenheim / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kahl, Peter Schumannstrasse 11 89547 Gerstetten / DE | 02 /
Joos, Uwe Klippeneckstrasse 17 86551 Königsbronn / DE | [2003/09] | Application number, filing date | 02011797.4 | 28.05.2002 | [2003/09] | Priority number, date | DE2001140801 | 20.08.2001 Original published format: DE 10140801 | [2003/09] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1285992 | Date: | 26.02.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1285992 | Date: | 26.09.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.12.2002 | Classification | IPC: | D21F5/04 | [2003/09] | CPC: |
D21F5/046 (EP,US);
D21F5/042 (EP,US);
Y10S277/906 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, DE, FI, IT, SE [2003/46] |
Former [2003/09] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Behandlung einer Faserstoffbahn | [2003/09] | English: | Device for treating a fibrous web | [2003/09] | French: | Dispositif pour le traitement d'une bande fibreuse | [2003/09] | Examination procedure | 26.08.2003 | Examination requested [2003/44] | 08.09.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.12.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.03.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.05.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.07.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.09.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.03.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.08.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 09.08.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.06.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US4185399 (GLADISH HERBERT E [CA]) [X] 1 * column 6, line 62 - column 7, line 10; figure - * [A] 2-31; | [A]DE4033901 (VOITH GMBH J M [DE]); | [DA]DE19716131 (VOITH SULZER PAPIERMASCH GMBH [DE]) [DA] 1-31 * abstract *; | [A]DE19817202 (VOITH SULZER PAPIERTECH PATENT [DE]) [A] 1-31 * abstract *; | [XA]US6247247 (YOEMAA SEPPO [FI], et al) [X] 1-4,7,10-12,27,30 * abstract * [A] 5,6,8,9,13-26,28,29,31 |