EP1264746 - Device for humidity detection [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.02.2008 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.11.2008 | Change - lapse in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 24.12.2008 [2008/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states VOGT electronic AG VOGT electronic Platz 1 94130 Obernzell / DE | [2002/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wimmer, Willi Hemerau 31 94051 Hauzenberg / DE | [2002/50] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/43] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | ||
Former [2004/42] | (deleted) | ||
Former [2003/29] | Finck, Dieter, Dr.Ing., et al v. Füner Ebbinghaus Finck Hano Postfach 95 01 60 81517 München / DE | ||
Former [2002/50] | Ebbinghaus, Dieter, Dipl.-Ing., et al v. Füner Ebbinghaus Finck Hano Mariahilfplatz 2 & 3 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02011864.2 | 28.05.2002 | [2002/50] | Priority number, date | DE2001127990 | 08.06.2001 Original published format: DE 10127990 | [2002/50] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1264746 | Date: | 11.12.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/50] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1264746 | Date: | 17.11.2004 | [2004/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1264746 | Date: | 11.04.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.10.2004 | Classification | IPC: | B60S1/08, G01N27/02, F27D19/00 | [2002/50] | CPC: |
B60S1/0829 (EP,US);
B60S1/0822 (EP,US);
G01N27/223 (EP,US);
B60S1/0877 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2005/31] |
Former [2002/50] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Befeuchtungserkennung | [2002/50] | English: | Device for humidity detection | [2002/50] | French: | Dispositif de détection d'humidité | [2002/50] | Examination procedure | 01.12.2004 | Examination requested [2005/05] | 18.05.2005 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 12.08.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.09.2005 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, GR, IE, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | 27.10.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.07.2006 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 14.07.2006 | 10.07.2006 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 14.07.2006 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 19.09.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.01.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 29.01.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.01.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 21.06.2005 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 21.06.2005 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 21.06.2005 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 21.06.2005 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 21.06.2005 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 21.06.2005 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 21.06.2005 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 21.06.2005 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 21.06.2005 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 21.06.2005 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 21.06.2005 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 21.06.2005 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 21.06.2005 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 21.06.2005 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 21.06.2005 | TR   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 11.04.2007 | GB | 11.04.2007 | IT | 11.04.2007 | [2008/52] |
Former [2008/23] | GB | 11.04.2007 | |
IT | 11.04.2007 | ||
FR | 07.12.2007 | ||
Former [2008/20] | GB | 11.04.2007 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US3906340 (WINGFIELD PETER MAURI, et al) [X] 1,17* column 1, line 5 - column 2, line 23; figure - *; | [X]DE3220123 (TOTAL FEUERSCHUTZ GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-7,16,17 * page 6, paragraph 2 - page 11, paragraph 1; figure . *; | [XA]DE3437950 (TARUTTIS ARNO H DIPL ING) [X] 1,6-8 * page 2, line 5 - page 3, line 26; figure - * [A] 2,5; | [XY]US4703237 (HOCHSTEIN PETER A [US]) [X] 1,2,4-10,15-17 * column 2, line 20 - column 6, line 30; figure - * [Y] 11-14; | [YA]US5682788 (NETZER YISHAY [IL]) [Y] 11-14 * column 4, line 39 - column 5, line 56 * * column 10, line 22 - line 48 * * figures 1A,9A,9B * [A] 1,2,6-10 | by applicant | DE4426736 |