EP1263254 - Mobile communication terminal [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.09.2006 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.10.2007 | Change - lapse in a contracting state State(s) deleted from list of lapses: IT | published on 07.11.2007 [2007/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NEC Corporation 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8001 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2002/49] | For all designated states NEC CORPORATION 7-1, Shiba 5-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kubosawa, Nobuyoshi, Nec Corporation 7-1, Shiba 5-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | [2002/49] | Representative(s) | Betten & Resch Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Maximiliansplatz 14 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/49] | Betten & Resch Patentanwälte, Theatinerstrasse 8 80333 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02011988.9 | 29.05.2002 | [2002/49] | Priority number, date | JP20010166788 | 01.06.2001 Original published format: JP 2001166788 | [2002/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1263254 | Date: | 04.12.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/49] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1263254 | Date: | 29.01.2003 | [2003/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1263254 | Date: | 16.11.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.12.2002 | Classification | IPC: | H04Q7/38 | [2002/49] | CPC: |
H04W36/365 (EP,US);
H04M15/00 (EP,US);
H04M2215/32 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2003/42] |
Former [2002/49] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Mobilkommunikationsendgerät | [2002/49] | English: | Mobile communication terminal | [2002/49] | French: | Terminal de communication mobile | [2002/49] | Examination procedure | 16.04.2003 | Examination requested [2003/25] | 17.02.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.08.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.05.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.09.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 12.09.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.08.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | deleted | [2007/45] |
Former [2007/37] | IT | 16.11.2005 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO9523485 (VOXSON INTERNATIONAL PTY LTD [AU], et al) [X] 1,5 * page 1, line 16 - page 2, line 9 * * page 7, line 18 - page 8, line 13 * * page 9, lines 21-26 * * page 13, line 14 - page 15, line 14 *; | [X]WO9612377 (WESTINGHOUSE ELECTRIC CORP [US]) [X] 1-4,6 * page 4, lines 8-33 * * page 5, lines 3-13 * * page 16, lines 1-30 * * page 19, lines 4-6 * * page 28, lines 7-13 *; | [X]WO0106803 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP]) [X] 1,4,6; | [A]WO0122764 (NOKIA NETWORKS OY [FI], et al) [A] 1-6 * the whole document *; | EP1115261 [ ] (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP]) [ ] * column 1, lines 5-9 * * column 2, line 56 - column 3, line 44 ** column 4, lines 30-58 * |