EP1277991 - Hydrostatic transmission and shift control method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.12.2009 Database last updated on 10.05.2025 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.10.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, TR | published on 09.11.2011 [2011/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Brueninghaus Hydromatik GmbH Glockeraustrasse 2 89275 Elchingen / DE | [2009/08] |
Former [2003/04] | For all designated states BRUENINGHAUS HYDROMATIK GMBH Glockeraustrasse 2 89275 Elchingen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Essig, Heinz-Gerhard Albstrasse 17 89173 Lonsee / DE | [2003/04] | Representative(s) | Körfer, Thomas, et al Mitscherlich PartmbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Postfach 33 06 09 80066 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/04] | Körfer, Thomas, Dipl.-Phys., et al Mitscherlich & Partner, Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Sonnenstrasse 33 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02012089.5 | 31.05.2002 | [2003/04] | Priority number, date | DE2001133358 | 10.07.2001 Original published format: DE 10133358 | [2003/04] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1277991 | Date: | 22.01.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/04] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1277991 | Date: | 09.05.2007 | [2007/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1277991 | Date: | 18.02.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.04.2007 | Classification | IPC: | F16H47/00, F16H61/42 | [2007/19] | CPC: |
F16H47/04 (EP);
F16H61/421 (EP);
F16H61/431 (EP);
F16H61/439 (EP);
F16H61/462 (EP);
F16H61/472 (EP);
B60K17/105 (EP);
F16H2306/44 (EP);
F16H2306/48 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2003/04] | F16H47/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/04] | Title | German: | Hydrostatischer Antrieb und Schaltverfahren | [2003/04] | English: | Hydrostatic transmission and shift control method | [2003/04] | French: | Transmission hydrostatique et méthode de changement de vitesses | [2003/04] | Examination procedure | 10.09.2007 | Examination requested [2007/43] | 08.11.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.12.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.05.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.06.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.08.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.12.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 22.12.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.11.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.05.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 18.02.2009 | DK | 18.02.2009 | FI | 18.02.2009 | IE | 18.02.2009 | NL | 18.02.2009 | TR | 18.02.2009 | SE | 18.05.2009 | GR | 19.05.2009 | ES | 29.05.2009 | AT | 31.05.2009 | BE | 31.05.2009 | CH | 31.05.2009 | LI | 31.05.2009 | LU | 31.05.2009 | MC | 31.05.2009 | PT | 27.07.2009 | [2011/44] |
Former [2011/21] | DK | 18.02.2009 | |
FI | 18.02.2009 | ||
IE | 18.02.2009 | ||
NL | 18.02.2009 | ||
SE | 18.05.2009 | ||
GR | 19.05.2009 | ||
ES | 29.05.2009 | ||
AT | 31.05.2009 | ||
BE | 31.05.2009 | ||
CH | 31.05.2009 | ||
LI | 31.05.2009 | ||
LU | 31.05.2009 | ||
MC | 31.05.2009 | ||
PT | 27.07.2009 | ||
Former [2010/47] | DK | 18.02.2009 | |
FI | 18.02.2009 | ||
IE | 18.02.2009 | ||
NL | 18.02.2009 | ||
SE | 18.05.2009 | ||
GR | 19.05.2009 | ||
ES | 29.05.2009 | ||
AT | 31.05.2009 | ||
BE | 31.05.2009 | ||
CH | 31.05.2009 | ||
LI | 31.05.2009 | ||
MC | 31.05.2009 | ||
PT | 27.07.2009 | ||
Former [2010/37] | DK | 18.02.2009 | |
FI | 18.02.2009 | ||
IE | 18.02.2009 | ||
NL | 18.02.2009 | ||
SE | 18.05.2009 | ||
ES | 29.05.2009 | ||
AT | 31.05.2009 | ||
BE | 31.05.2009 | ||
CH | 31.05.2009 | ||
LI | 31.05.2009 | ||
MC | 31.05.2009 | ||
PT | 27.07.2009 | ||
Former [2010/28] | DK | 18.02.2009 | |
FI | 18.02.2009 | ||
IE | 18.02.2009 | ||
NL | 18.02.2009 | ||
SE | 18.05.2009 | ||
ES | 29.05.2009 | ||
BE | 31.05.2009 | ||
CH | 31.05.2009 | ||
LI | 31.05.2009 | ||
MC | 31.05.2009 | ||
PT | 27.07.2009 | ||
Former [2010/08] | DK | 18.02.2009 | |
FI | 18.02.2009 | ||
IE | 18.02.2009 | ||
NL | 18.02.2009 | ||
SE | 18.05.2009 | ||
ES | 29.05.2009 | ||
CH | 31.05.2009 | ||
LI | 31.05.2009 | ||
MC | 31.05.2009 | ||
PT | 27.07.2009 | ||
Former [2010/04] | DK | 18.02.2009 | |
FI | 18.02.2009 | ||
IE | 18.02.2009 | ||
NL | 18.02.2009 | ||
SE | 18.05.2009 | ||
ES | 29.05.2009 | ||
MC | 31.05.2009 | ||
PT | 27.07.2009 | ||
Former [2009/49] | DK | 18.02.2009 | |
FI | 18.02.2009 | ||
IE | 18.02.2009 | ||
NL | 18.02.2009 | ||
SE | 18.05.2009 | ||
ES | 29.05.2009 | ||
PT | 27.07.2009 | ||
Former [2009/47] | DK | 18.02.2009 | |
FI | 18.02.2009 | ||
IE | 18.02.2009 | ||
NL | 18.02.2009 | ||
SE | 18.05.2009 | ||
ES | 29.05.2009 | ||
Former [2009/46] | DK | 18.02.2009 | |
FI | 18.02.2009 | ||
NL | 18.02.2009 | ||
SE | 18.05.2009 | ||
ES | 29.05.2009 | ||
Former [2009/37] | FI | 18.02.2009 | |
NL | 18.02.2009 | ||
SE | 18.05.2009 | ||
ES | 29.05.2009 | ||
Former [2009/34] | NL | 18.02.2009 | |
ES | 29.05.2009 | ||
Former [2009/33] | ES | 29.05.2009 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE2652976 (LINDE AG) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [X]DE4234826 (HYDROMATIK GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-3,5-10,12-14 * the whole document *; | [X]DE19753729 (ZAHNRADFABRIK FRIEDRICHSHAFEN [DE]) [X] 1,3,9,13 * the whole document *; | [A]DE19858958 (KOMATSU MFG CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [X]EP1020314 (SAUER SUNDSTRAND GMBH [DE], et al) [X] 1,9 * the whole document *; | [A]EP1076194 (EATON CORP [US]) [A] 1-15* the whole document * |