EP1264947 - Building, particulary hotel or appartment building [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.11.2008 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.08.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 23.09.2009 [2009/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Haueisen-Strauss, Hiltrud-Anne Weilheimer Strasse 20 73230 Kirchheim-Teck / DE | [2002/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2002/50] | Representative(s) | DREISS Patentanwälte PartG mbB Postfach 10 37 62 70032 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/50] | Dreiss, Fuhlendorf, Steimle & Becker Patentanwälte, Postfach 10 37 62 70032 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 02012250.3 | 04.06.2002 | [2002/50] | Priority number, date | DE2001127203 | 05.06.2001 Original published format: DE 10127203 | [2002/50] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1264947 | Date: | 11.12.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/50] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1264947 | Date: | 04.02.2004 | [2004/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1264947 | Date: | 02.01.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.12.2003 | Classification | IPC: | E04H3/08, E04H6/28, E04H1/02, E04H14/00 | [2004/06] | CPC: |
E04H3/02 (EP);
E04H1/04 (EP);
E04H6/282 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2002/50] | E04H3/08, E04H6/28, E04H1/02 | Designated contracting states | ES, FR, GB, IT, MC [2004/44] |
Former [2002/50] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Gebäude, insbesondere Hotel- oder Appartementgebäude | [2002/50] | English: | Building, particulary hotel or appartment building | [2002/50] | French: | Immeuble, en particulier hotel ou immeuble d'appartements | [2002/50] | Examination procedure | 30.07.2004 | Examination requested [2004/40] | 05.08.2004 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 23.11.2004 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, FI, GR, IE, LU, NL, PT, SE, TR | 08.09.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.03.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.07.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.11.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 19.11.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.10.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 08.09.2004 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 08.09.2004 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 08.09.2004 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 08.09.2004 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 08.09.2004 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 08.09.2004 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 08.09.2004 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 08.09.2004 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 08.09.2004 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 08.09.2004 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 08.09.2004 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 08.09.2004 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 08.09.2004 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 08.09.2004 | TR   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 02.01.2008 | ES | 13.04.2008 | MC | 30.06.2008 | [2009/39] |
Former [2009/07] | ES | 13.04.2008 | |
MC | 30.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/35] | ES | 13.04.2008 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]CH340336 (VON GONZENBACH FEDERICO [CH]) [X] 1,2,4,5,7* the whole document *; | [X]FR1400390 (ROLLAND PIERRE MARIE ROBERT) [X] 1,2,4-7 * page 1, column L, line 1 - line 35 * * page 3, column R, line 35 - line 51; figures 1-3,18,18BIS *; | [X]DE1559303 (WEGMANN & CO) [X] 1,2,4-7 * page 2, line 18 - page 3, line 11 * * page 4, line 15 - page 5, line 5; figure - * | by applicant | DE1916391 |