EP1323408 - Dental alginate impression material composition [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.11.2005 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 16.01.2008 [2008/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GC Corporation 76-1, Hasunuma-cho Itabashi-ku Tokyo 174-8585 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2003/27] | For all designated states GC Corporation 76-1, Hasunuma-cho Itabashi-ku, Tokyo 174 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kamohara, Hiroshi c/o GC Corporation, No. 76-1 Hasunuma-cho, Itabashi-ku, Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Watanabe, Nobutaka c/o GC Corporation, No. 76-1 Hasunuma-cho, Itabashi-ku, Tokyo / JP | 03 /
Takeo, Makiko c/o GC Corporation, No. 76-1 Hasunuma-cho, Itabashi-ku, Tokyo / JP | 04 /
Naito, Hiroki c/o GC Corporation, No. 76-1 Hasunuma-cho, Itabashi-ku, Tokyo / JP | [2003/27] | Representative(s) | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/27] | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte Grafinger Strasse 2 81671 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02012322.0 | 04.06.2002 | [2003/27] | Priority number, date | JP20010391026 | 25.12.2001 Original published format: JP 2001391026 | [2003/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1323408 | Date: | 02.07.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1323408 | Date: | 29.12.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/53] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.10.2002 | Classification | IPC: | A61K6/10 | [2003/27] | CPC: |
A61K6/90 (EP,US);
A61K6/00 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/27] | Title | German: | Dental Alginat-Abformmasse | [2003/27] | English: | Dental alginate impression material composition | [2003/27] | French: | Matériau d'alginate pour empreintes dentaires | [2003/27] | Examination procedure | 07.08.2003 | Examination requested [2003/41] | 16.07.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.09.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 16.09.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.09.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 29.12.2004 | BE | 29.12.2004 | CH | 29.12.2004 | FI | 29.12.2004 | IT | 29.12.2004 | LI | 29.12.2004 | NL | 29.12.2004 | TR | 29.12.2004 | DK | 29.03.2005 | GR | 29.03.2005 | SE | 29.03.2005 | ES | 09.04.2005 | PT | 29.05.2005 | CY | 04.06.2005 | LU | 04.06.2005 | IE | 07.06.2005 | MC | 30.06.2005 | [2008/03] |
Former [2007/37] | AT | 29.12.2004 | |
BE | 29.12.2004 | ||
CH | 29.12.2004 | ||
FI | 29.12.2004 | ||
IT | 29.12.2004 | ||
LI | 29.12.2004 | ||
NL | 29.12.2004 | ||
TR | 29.12.2004 | ||
DK | 29.03.2005 | ||
GR | 29.03.2005 | ||
SE | 29.03.2005 | ||
ES | 09.04.2005 | ||
CY | 04.06.2005 | ||
LU | 04.06.2005 | ||
IE | 07.06.2005 | ||
MC | 30.06.2005 | ||
Former [2007/26] | AT | 29.12.2004 | |
BE | 29.12.2004 | ||
CH | 29.12.2004 | ||
FI | 29.12.2004 | ||
LI | 29.12.2004 | ||
NL | 29.12.2004 | ||
TR | 29.12.2004 | ||
DK | 29.03.2005 | ||
GR | 29.03.2005 | ||
SE | 29.03.2005 | ||
ES | 09.04.2005 | ||
CY | 04.06.2005 | ||
LU | 04.06.2005 | ||
IE | 07.06.2005 | ||
MC | 30.06.2005 | ||
Former [2007/20] | AT | 29.12.2004 | |
BE | 29.12.2004 | ||
CH | 29.12.2004 | ||
FI | 29.12.2004 | ||
LI | 29.12.2004 | ||
NL | 29.12.2004 | ||
TR | 29.12.2004 | ||
DK | 29.03.2005 | ||
GR | 29.03.2005 | ||
SE | 29.03.2005 | ||
ES | 09.04.2005 | ||
CY | 04.06.2005 | ||
IE | 07.06.2005 | ||
LU | 30.06.2005 | ||
MC | 30.06.2005 | ||
Former [2007/10] | AT | 29.12.2004 | |
BE | 29.12.2004 | ||
CH | 29.12.2004 | ||
FI | 29.12.2004 | ||
LI | 29.12.2004 | ||
NL | 29.12.2004 | ||
TR | 29.12.2004 | ||
DK | 29.03.2005 | ||
GR | 29.03.2005 | ||
SE | 29.03.2005 | ||
ES | 09.04.2005 | ||
IE | 07.06.2005 | ||
LU | 30.06.2005 | ||
MC | 30.06.2005 | ||
Former [2006/52] | AT | 29.12.2004 | |
BE | 29.12.2004 | ||
CH | 29.12.2004 | ||
FI | 29.12.2004 | ||
LI | 29.12.2004 | ||
NL | 29.12.2004 | ||
TR | 29.12.2004 | ||
DK | 29.03.2005 | ||
GR | 29.03.2005 | ||
ES | 09.04.2005 | ||
IE | 07.06.2005 | ||
MC | 30.06.2005 | ||
Former [2006/28] | AT | 29.12.2004 | |
BE | 29.12.2004 | ||
CH | 29.12.2004 | ||
FI | 29.12.2004 | ||
LI | 29.12.2004 | ||
NL | 29.12.2004 | ||
DK | 29.03.2005 | ||
GR | 29.03.2005 | ||
ES | 09.04.2005 | ||
IE | 07.06.2005 | ||
MC | 30.06.2005 | ||
Former [2006/25] | AT | 29.12.2004 | |
BE | 29.12.2004 | ||
CH | 29.12.2004 | ||
FI | 29.12.2004 | ||
LI | 29.12.2004 | ||
NL | 29.12.2004 | ||
DK | 29.03.2005 | ||
GR | 29.03.2005 | ||
ES | 09.04.2005 | ||
IE | 07.06.2005 | ||
Former [2006/14] | AT | 29.12.2004 | |
BE | 29.12.2004 | ||
CH | 29.12.2004 | ||
FI | 29.12.2004 | ||
LI | 29.12.2004 | ||
NL | 29.12.2004 | ||
DK | 29.03.2005 | ||
GR | 29.03.2005 | ||
ES | 09.04.2005 | ||
Former [2006/12] | AT | 29.12.2004 | |
BE | 29.12.2004 | ||
CH | 29.12.2004 | ||
FI | 29.12.2004 | ||
LI | 29.12.2004 | ||
DK | 29.03.2005 | ||
GR | 29.03.2005 | ||
ES | 09.04.2005 | ||
Former [2005/51] | AT | 29.12.2004 | |
BE | 29.12.2004 | ||
FI | 29.12.2004 | ||
GR | 29.03.2005 | ||
Former [2005/36] | AT | 29.12.2004 | |
FI | 29.12.2004 | ||
GR | 29.03.2005 | ||
Former [2005/26] | FI | 29.12.2004 | |
GR | 29.03.2005 | ||
Former [2005/24] | FI | 29.12.2004 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2678280 (NOYES STANLEY E, et al) [A] 1,2 * column 2, line 52 - column 3, line 66 * * example - * * claim - *; | [A]GB776501 (DANILO COZZI) [A] 1,2 * page 1, line 19 - line 27 * * page 2, line 23 - line 72 * * claim - *; | [A]US2816843 (ERICKSON WALLACE A) [A] 1,2 * column 2, line 34 - line L * * example - ** claim - *; | [A]GB1044160 (DANILO COZZI) [A] 1,2 * claim - * * page 4, line 17 - line 123 *; | [A]AU461693B (MARRICKVILLE HOLDINGS LTD) [A] 1,2 * claim - * * table . * |