EP1267223 - Surface contacting member for toner fusing system and process, composition for member surface layer, and process for preparing composition [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.06.2007 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.08.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 17.09.2008 [2008/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Eastman Kodak Company 343 State Street Rochester, NY 14650-2201 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/38] | For all designated states Eastman Kodak Company 343 State Street Rochester NY 14650-2201 / US | ||
Former [2004/45] | For all designated states Eastman Kodak Company 343 State Street Rochester, New York 14650 / US | ||
Former [2004/37] | For all designated states Eastman Kodak Company 343 State Street Rochester, New York 14650 / US | ||
For all designated states NexPress Solutions LLC 1447 St. Paul Street Rochester, NY 14653-7103 / US | |||
Former [2002/51] | For all designated states Heidelberger Druckmaschinen Aktiengesellschaft Kurfürsten-Anlage 52-60 69115 Heidelberg / DE | ||
For all designated states NexPress Solutions LLC 1447 St. Paul Street Rochester, NY 14653-7103 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Davis, Stephen V. 27 Township Road 1372, Apartment 201 Proctorville, OH 45669 / US | 02 /
Miller, Theodora 420 Pinnacle Road Rochester, NY 14623 / US | 03 /
Pickering, Jerry A. 97 Frisbee Hill Road Hilton, NY 14468 / US | [2002/51] | Representative(s) | Haile, Helen Cynthia, et al Kodak Limited Patent Department (W160-G) Headstone Drive Harrow, Middlesex HA1 4TY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2004/40] | Haile, Helen Cynthia, et al Kodak Limited Patent, W92-3A, Headstone Drive Harrow, Middlesex HA1 4TY / GB | ||
Former [2002/51] | Franzen, Peter Heidelberger Druckmaschinen AG, Kurfürsten-Anlage 52-60 69115 Heidelberg / DE | Application number, filing date | 02012421.0 | 10.06.2002 | [2002/51] | Priority number, date | US20010879466 | 12.06.2001 Original published format: US 879466 | [2002/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1267223 | Date: | 18.12.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/51] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1267223 | Date: | 12.07.2006 | [2006/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.06.2006 | Classification | IPC: | G03G15/20 | [2002/51] | CPC: |
G03G15/2057 (EP,US);
Y10T428/259 (EP,US);
Y10T428/3154 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31544 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2007/12] |
Former [2002/51] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Oberflächenkontaktelement für ein Tonerfixiersystem und zugehöriges Verfahren, Zusammensetzung für die Oberflächenschicht des Elementes sowie Verfahren zur Herstellung der Zusammensetzung | [2002/51] | English: | Surface contacting member for toner fusing system and process, composition for member surface layer, and process for preparing composition | [2002/51] | French: | Elément de contact superficiel pour un système de fixage de toner et procédé, composition de la couche superficielle de tel élément, et procédé de préparation de telle composition | [2002/51] | Examination procedure | 13.01.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/28] | 12.02.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2007/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2006 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5102763 (WINNIK FRANCOISE M [CA], et al) [A] 16-29 * column 3, line 13 - column 17, line 49 *; | [AD]US5217837 (HENRY ARNOLD W [US], et al) [AD] 1-29* the whole document *; | [AD]US5332641 (FINN PATRICK J [US], et al) [AD] 1-29 * the whole document *; | [A]US5547742 (SATOH MAKOTO [JP], et al) [A] 1-29 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0867785 (XEROX CORP [US]) [A] 1-29 * column 6, line 47 - column 14, line 45 *; | [A]EP1093032 (XEROX CORP [US]) [A] 1-29 * the whole document * |