EP1273612 - Oligomeric siloxanes, process for their preparation and their use [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.07.2007 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.09.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 14.10.2009 [2009/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Degussa GmbH Bennigsenplatz 1 40474 Düsseldorf / DE | [2007/08] |
Former [2003/02] | For all designated states Degussa AG Bennigsenplatz 1 40474 Düsseldorf / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Krafczyk, Roland, Dr. Barrystrasse 6 79618 Rheinfelden / DE | 02 /
Monkiewicz, Jaroslaw, Dr. Burstelstrasse 2A 79618 Rheinfelden / DE | 03 /
Treffeisen, Börn Schönbergstrasse 2 79194 Gundelfingen / DE | [2003/02] | Application number, filing date | 02012517.5 | 05.06.2002 | [2003/02] | Priority number, date | DE2001132942 | 06.07.2001 Original published format: DE 10132942 | [2003/02] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1273612 | Date: | 08.01.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/02] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1273612 | Date: | 07.05.2003 | [2003/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1273612 | Date: | 20.09.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.03.2003 | Classification | IPC: | C08G77/22, C08G77/26, C08G77/28, C08G77/04, C08G77/38, C08L21/00 | [2003/02] | CPC: |
C08G77/28 (EP,KR,US);
C08G77/04 (EP,US);
C08G77/22 (EP,US);
C08L21/00 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C08L21/00, C08L2666/14 (EP,US);
C08L21/00, C08L83/04 (US,EP);
C08L21/00, C08L83/08 (US,EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/02] | Title | German: | Siloxan-Oligomere, Verfahren zu deren Herstellung und deren Verwendung | [2003/02] | English: | Oligomeric siloxanes, process for their preparation and their use | [2003/02] | French: | Siloxanes oligomères, procédé pour leur fabrication et leur utilisation | [2003/02] | Examination procedure | 05.06.2002 | Examination requested [2003/02] | 17.10.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.02.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.05.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.06.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 23.06.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.06.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 20.09.2006 | FI | 20.09.2006 | FR | 20.09.2006 | GB | 20.09.2006 | IE | 20.09.2006 | IT | 20.09.2006 | NL | 20.09.2006 | TR | 20.09.2006 | DK | 20.12.2006 | SE | 20.12.2006 | GR | 21.12.2006 | ES | 31.12.2006 | PT | 12.03.2007 | AT | 05.06.2007 | LU | 05.06.2007 | [2009/42] |
Former [2009/37] | CY | 20.09.2006 | |
FI | 20.09.2006 | ||
FR | 20.09.2006 | ||
GB | 20.09.2006 | ||
IE | 20.09.2006 | ||
IT | 20.09.2006 | ||
NL | 20.09.2006 | ||
DK | 20.12.2006 | ||
SE | 20.12.2006 | ||
GR | 21.12.2006 | ||
ES | 31.12.2006 | ||
PT | 12.03.2007 | ||
AT | 05.06.2007 | ||
LU | 05.06.2007 | ||
Former [2008/52] | FI | 20.09.2006 | |
FR | 20.09.2006 | ||
GB | 20.09.2006 | ||
IE | 20.09.2006 | ||
IT | 20.09.2006 | ||
NL | 20.09.2006 | ||
DK | 20.12.2006 | ||
SE | 20.12.2006 | ||
GR | 21.12.2006 | ||
ES | 31.12.2006 | ||
PT | 12.03.2007 | ||
AT | 05.06.2007 | ||
Former [2008/39] | FI | 20.09.2006 | |
GB | 20.09.2006 | ||
IE | 20.09.2006 | ||
IT | 20.09.2006 | ||
NL | 20.09.2006 | ||
DK | 20.12.2006 | ||
SE | 20.12.2006 | ||
GR | 21.12.2006 | ||
ES | 31.12.2006 | ||
PT | 12.03.2007 | ||
FR | 18.05.2007 | ||
AT | 05.06.2007 | ||
Former [2008/23] | FI | 20.09.2006 | |
GB | 20.09.2006 | ||
IE | 20.09.2006 | ||
IT | 20.09.2006 | ||
NL | 20.09.2006 | ||
DK | 20.12.2006 | ||
SE | 20.12.2006 | ||
GR | 21.12.2006 | ||
ES | 31.12.2006 | ||
PT | 12.03.2007 | ||
FR | 18.05.2007 | ||
Former [2008/20] | FI | 20.09.2006 | |
GB | 20.09.2006 | ||
IE | 20.09.2006 | ||
IT | 20.09.2006 | ||
NL | 20.09.2006 | ||
DK | 20.12.2006 | ||
SE | 20.12.2006 | ||
GR | 21.12.2006 | ||
ES | 31.12.2006 | ||
PT | 12.03.2007 | ||
Former [2007/37] | FI | 20.09.2006 | |
GB | 20.09.2006 | ||
IE | 20.09.2006 | ||
IT | 20.09.2006 | ||
NL | 20.09.2006 | ||
DK | 20.12.2006 | ||
SE | 20.12.2006 | ||
ES | 31.12.2006 | ||
PT | 12.03.2007 | ||
Former [2007/35] | FI | 20.09.2006 | |
GB | 20.09.2006 | ||
IE | 20.09.2006 | ||
IT | 20.09.2006 | ||
NL | 20.09.2006 | ||
SE | 20.12.2006 | ||
ES | 31.12.2006 | ||
PT | 12.03.2007 | ||
Former [2007/28] | FI | 20.09.2006 | |
GB | 20.09.2006 | ||
IE | 20.09.2006 | ||
NL | 20.09.2006 | ||
SE | 20.12.2006 | ||
ES | 31.12.2006 | ||
PT | 12.03.2007 | ||
Former [2007/27] | FI | 20.09.2006 | |
IE | 20.09.2006 | ||
NL | 20.09.2006 | ||
SE | 20.12.2006 | ||
ES | 31.12.2006 | ||
PT | 12.03.2007 | ||
Former [2007/25] | FI | 20.09.2006 | |
IE | 20.09.2006 | ||
NL | 20.09.2006 | ||
SE | 20.12.2006 | ||
ES | 31.12.2006 | ||
Former [2007/21] | FI | 20.09.2006 | |
NL | 20.09.2006 | ||
SE | 20.12.2006 | ||
ES | 31.12.2006 | ||
Former [2007/19] | FI | 20.09.2006 | |
NL | 20.09.2006 | ||
SE | 20.12.2006 | ||
Former [2007/10] | FI | 20.09.2006 | |
SE | 20.12.2006 | Documents cited: | Search | [XD]EP0652245 (SHINETSU CHEMICAL CO [JP]) [XD] 1,2,4,5 * example 26 *; | [X]DE19825796 (DEGUSSA [DE]) [X] 1,3,13,14 * example 1; claims 8,9 *; | [X]US6107505 (YOSHIDA KAZUHIRO [JP], et al) [X] 6-12* column 3, line 38; examples 1-13 * |