EP1243569 - Electrical circuit having a metal-bonded-ceramic material or MBC component as an insulating substrate [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.03.2013 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.03.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.04.2013 [2013/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DOWA METALTECH CO., LTD. 4-14-1, Soto-Kanda Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 101-0021 / JP | [2007/46] |
Former [2007/45] | For all designated states Dowa Holdings Co., Ltd. 14-1, Sotokanda 4-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | ||
Former [2002/39] | For all designated states Dowa Mining Co., Ltd. 8-2, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nagata, Choju, Dowa Mining Co.. Ltd. 8-2, Marunouchi 1-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Ning, Xiao-Shang DOWA MINING CO.,LTD., 8-2, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo / JP | 03 /
Sakuraba, Masami DOWA MINING CO.,LTD., 8-2, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo / JP | 04 /
Tanaka, Toshikazu DOWA MINING CO.,LTD., 8-2, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo / JP | 05 /
Kimura, Masami DOWA MINING CO.,LTD., 8-2, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo / JP | [2002/39] | Representative(s) | Strehl Schübel-Hopf & Partner Maximilianstrasse 54 80538 München / DE | [2002/39] | Application number, filing date | 02012565.4 | 10.04.1995 | [2002/39] | Priority number, date | JP19940096941 | 11.04.1994 Original published format: JP 9694194 | [2002/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1243569 | Date: | 25.09.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/39] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1243569 | Date: | 19.11.2008 | [2008/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.10.2008 | Classification | IPC: | H01L21/48, H01L23/373, C04B41/88, B22D19/14, C23C2/00 | [2008/47] | CPC: |
C04B41/009 (EP);
C04B37/02 (KR);
C23C2/0062 (EP,KR,US);
B22D19/14 (EP);
C04B41/4523 (EP);
C04B41/51 (EP);
C04B41/81 (EP);
C04B41/88 (EP);
C23C2/12 (EP);
C23C2/36 (EP);
C23C30/00 (EP);
H01L21/4871 (EP);
H01L23/3735 (EP);
H05K3/0061 (EP);
C04B2111/00844 (EP);
| C-Set: |
C04B41/009, C04B35/00 (EP);
C04B41/51, C04B41/4523 (EP);
H01L2924/0002, H01L2924/00 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2002/39] | C04B41/88 | Designated contracting states | DE, GB [2002/39] | Title | German: | Elektrische Schaltung mit einem metallgebundenen Keramik Material oder MGK Komponent als isolierendes Substrat | [2002/39] | English: | Electrical circuit having a metal-bonded-ceramic material or MBC component as an insulating substrate | [2002/39] | French: | Circuit électrique comportant un matériau ou un composant à liaison métal-céramique comme substrat isolant | [2002/39] | Examination procedure | 02.07.2002 | Examination requested [2002/39] | 01.07.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.01.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.11.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/17] | 07.12.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2013/17] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP95105372.7 / EP0676800 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP19950105372) is 15.06.1999 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 02.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 02.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 22.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 19.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 14.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 16.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 12.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 22.04.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 23.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 23.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 16 | 21.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 17 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2012 | 18   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]JPS58138061 (SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES) [X] 1,2,4 * abstract * [A] 3; | [X]US4409278 (JOCHYM ERIC P [US]) [X] 1-4 * column 2, line 39 - column 8, line 61; figures 2-5; claims 11,13,20 *; | [XA]EP0097944 (TOKYO SHIBAURA ELECTRIC CO [JP]) [X] 1-3 * page 3, line 17 - page 9, line 19 * [A] 4; | [A]DE3804124 (HTK GES FUER HOCHTEMPERATURKER [DE]) [A] 1-4* the whole document *; | [A]EP0351203 (NGK INSULATORS LTD [JP]) [A] 1-4 * column 1, line 3 - column 7, line 50; figures 2,3 * | by applicant | JPS5237914 | JPS59121890 | JPH0393687 | JPH03125463 | JPH0412554 | JPH0418746 | JPH04355211 |