09.03.2012 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 11.04.2012 [2012/15] |
01.04.2011 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 04.05.2011 [2011/18] |
01.04.2011 |
Change - inventor |
published on 04.05.2011 [2011/18] |
09.03.2011 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
09.03.2011 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
15.10.2010 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
28.05.2010 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
16.04.2010 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
13.04.2010 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
25.11.2009 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
07.07.2009 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
18.07.2008 |
Change - divisional application(s) |
published on 20.08.2008 [2008/34] |
08.07.2008 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
17.06.2008 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
08.04.2008 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
16.11.2007 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
03.11.2007 |
New entry: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings |
|
21.06.2007 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
01.06.2007 |
New entry: Date of oral proceedings |
|
07.04.2007 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
03.02.2007 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
08.09.2006 |
First examination report |
|
05.09.2006 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
05.07.2006 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
14.06.2006 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
02.06.2006 |
Definitive list of designations |
published on 05.07.2006 [2006/27] |
05.05.2006 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 07.06.2006 [2006/23] |
09.09.2005 |
Publication of search report |
published on 26.10.2005 [2005/43] |
07.07.2005 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
25.06.2004 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
26.09.2003 |
Change - representative |
published on 12.11.2003 [2003/46] |
25.10.2002 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 11.12.2002 [2002/50] |