EP1266739 - Method and apparatus for introducing colorant or the like to resinous materials [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.05.2006 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.09.2008 | Change - representative | published on 22.10.2008 [2008/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states R & D Technology, Inc. 1000 Rubber Way, 61 S.Highway Vicksburg Mississipi 39182 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2002/51] | For all designated states R & D Technology, Inc. 1000 Rubber Way, 61 S.Highway Vicksburg, Mississipi 39182 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Rouse, Michael W. 325 Fairways Drive Vicksburg, Mississippi 391820 / US | 02 /
Deeb, Victor M. 81 Freemont Street Marlborough, Massachusetts 01752 / US | [2002/51] | Representative(s) | Plate, Jürgen, et al Plate Schweitzer Zounek Patentanwalt Industriepark Kalle-Albert, Gebäude H391 Rheingaustraße 196 65203 Wiesbaden / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/43] | Plate, Jürgen, et al Plate Schweitzer Zounek Patentanwälte Rheingaustrasse 196 65203 Wiesbaden / DE | ||
Former [2002/51] | Plate, Jürgen, Dr., et al Patentanwaltskanzlei Zounek, Industriepark Kalle-Albert, Rheingaustrass196 65203 Wiesbaden / DE | Application number, filing date | 02012778.3 | 10.06.2002 | [2002/51] | Priority number, date | US20010296774P | 11.06.2001 Original published format: US 296774 P | [2002/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1266739 | Date: | 18.12.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.09.2002 | Classification | IPC: | B29B7/88, C08J3/00 | [2002/51] | CPC: |
B29B7/88 (EP,US);
B29B7/002 (EP,US);
C08J3/203 (EP,US);
C08J3/205 (EP,US);
B29K2021/00 (EP,US);
B29K2075/00 (EP,US);
B29K2105/0032 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/51] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Einbringung von Farbe oder dergleichen in ein Harzmaterial | [2002/51] | English: | Method and apparatus for introducing colorant or the like to resinous materials | [2002/51] | French: | Appareil et méthode pour introduire un colorant ou des produits similaires dans une matière résineuse | [2002/51] | Examination procedure | 18.06.2003 | Examination requested [2003/34] | 31.12.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/25] | 03.02.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2006/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2005 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2622277 (BALTZAR BONELL FRANS TORE, et al) [X] 10-16,18-20 * column 1, line 27 - column 2, line 27; figure 1 *; | [X]US2935763 (NEWMAN FERRIS E, et al) [X] 1,2,9 * column 2, line 45 - column 3, line 17 *; | [X]GB948746 (PAUL WALTER) [X] 1-9 * see the whole document *; | [A]US3636136 (KONOPIK ALVIN E) [A] 1-9 * column 1, line 35 - column 2, line 7 ** column 4, line 42 - column 5, line 34 *; | [X]FR2289572 (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) [X] 1-9 * page 3, line 36 - page 4, line 24 * * page 9, line 34 - page 11, line 23 *; | [X]US5711904 (ESWARAN VETKAV RAJAGOPALAN [US], et al) [X] 10-15,18-20 * column 1, line 4 - line 35 * * column 4, line 28 - line 48 * * column 6, line 5 - column 7, line 42 *; | [A]EP1027975 (R & D TECHNOLOGY INC [US]) [A] 1-20 * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0008] * * paragraph [0019] - paragraph [0025] * |