EP1372124 - Alarm detector with commnication interface and alarm system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.06.2005 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.06.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.08.2005 [2005/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens Building Technologies AG Bellerivestrasse 36 8034 Zürich / CH | [2003/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Rechsteiner, Martin, Dr. Steinbrüchelstrasse 6 8708 Männedorf / CH | 02 /
Sennhauser, Marc Tägernaustrasse 6 8645 Jona / CH | [2003/51] | Representative(s) | Berg, Peter, et al European Patent Attorney Siemens AG Postfach 22 16 34 80506 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/18] | Berg, Peter, Dipl.-Ing., et al European Patent Attorney, Siemens AG, Postfach 22 16 34 80506 München / DE | ||
Former [2003/51] | Dittrich, Horst, Dr. Siemens Building Technologies AG, Fire and Security Products, Alte Landstrasse 411 8708 Männedorf / CH | Application number, filing date | 02012786.6 | 10.06.2002 | [2003/51] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1372124 | Date: | 17.12.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.12.2002 | Classification | IPC: | G08B13/19, G08B29/04, G08B25/10, G08B25/14 | [2003/51] | CPC: |
G08B13/19 (EP,US);
G08B25/10 (EP,US);
G08B25/14 (EP,US);
G08B29/046 (EP,US);
G08B25/007 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/51] | Title | German: | Gefahrenmelder mit Kommunikationsschnittstelle und Gefahrenmeldesystem | [2003/51] | English: | Alarm detector with commnication interface and alarm system | [2003/51] | French: | Capteur d'alarme avec interface de communication et système d'alarme | [2003/51] | Examination procedure | 16.06.2004 | Examination requested [2004/34] | 20.09.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.02.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/32] | 08.03.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2005/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DXY]EP0872817 (CERBERUS AG [CH]) [DX] 1,2,5-7,10,12 * column 2, line 28 - line 38 * * column 2, line 57 - column 3, line 4 * * column 3, line 37 - line 41 * * column 4, line 41 - line 45 * * column 4, line 56 - column 5, line 22 * * column 7, line 5 - line 18 * [Y] 11; | [YA]EP1158840 (HTS HIGH TECHNOLOGY SYSTEMS AG [CH]) [Y] 11 * figure 1 *[A] 3,4 |