EP1278046 - Electromagnetic flowmeter [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.05.2015 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.05.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.06.2015 [2015/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KROHNE MESSTECHNIK GMBH & CO. KG Ludwig-Krohne-Strasse 5 47058 Duisburg / DE | [2003/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Florin, Wilhelm, Dipl.-Ing. Heideweg 21 47198 Duisburg / DE | [2003/04] | Representative(s) | Gesthuysen Patentanwälte Patentanwälte Postfach 10 13 54 45013 Essen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/44] | Gesthuysen, von Rohr & Eggert Patentanwälte Postfach 10 13 54 45013 Essen / DE | ||
Former [2003/04] | Gesthuysen, von Rohr & Eggert Patentanwälte Postfach 10 13 54 45013 Essen / DE | Application number, filing date | 02012912.8 | 11.06.2002 | [2003/04] | Priority number, date | DE20011034672 | 20.07.2001 Original published format: DE 10134672 | [2003/04] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1278046 | Date: | 22.01.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/04] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1278046 | Date: | 04.08.2004 | [2004/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.06.2004 | Classification | IPC: | G01F1/60 | [2003/04] | CPC: |
G01F1/60 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/04] | Title | German: | Magnetisch-induktives Durchflussmessgerät | [2003/04] | English: | Electromagnetic flowmeter | [2003/04] | French: | Débitmètre électromagnétique | [2003/04] | Examination procedure | 05.01.2005 | Examination requested [2005/10] | 20.12.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.07.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.01.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/24] | 02.02.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2015/24] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 20.12.2006 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 29.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 28.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 29.06.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 16.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2013 | 12   M06   Fee paid on   16.07.2013 | 30.06.2014 | 13   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US4818994 (ORTH KELLY M [US], et al) [Y] 1-3,5,6 * the whole document *; | [X]EP0548439 (FLOWTEC AG [CH]) [X] 1,2,4-6,9 * the whole document *; | [Y]US5377128 (MCBEAN RONALD V [US]) [Y] 1-3,5,6 * the whole document *; | [X]US5469746 (FUKUNAGA MASAO [JP], et al) [X] 1,2,4-6,9 * the whole document *; | [Y]US5495769 (BRODEN DAVID A [US], et al) [Y] 1-3,5,6* the whole document * |