Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
30.06.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.08.2006 [2006/31] |
04.02.2006 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | |
30.07.2005 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit | |
22.06.2004 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
06.12.2002 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 22.01.2003 [2003/04] |