EP1271265 - Cartridge detachably mountable on image forming apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.09.2009 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.09.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 28.10.2009 [2009/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 3-30-2, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2003/01] | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 3-30-2 Shimomaruko Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sato, Minoru Canon Kabushiki Kaisha, 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Sasaki, Teruhiko Canon Kabushiki Kaisha, 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP | [2003/01] | Representative(s) | TBK Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/34] | TBK-Patent Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2003/01] | Leson, Thomas Johannes Alois, Dipl.-Ing. Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner GbR, TBK-Patent, Bavariaring 4 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02013255.1 | 17.06.2002 | [2003/01] | Priority number, date | JP20010183663 | 18.06.2001 Original published format: JP 2001183663 | [2003/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1271265 | Date: | 02.01.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/01] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1271265 | Date: | 29.03.2006 | [2006/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1271265 | Date: | 19.11.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.02.2006 | Classification | IPC: | G03G21/18 | [2003/01] | CPC: |
G03G21/1832 (EP,US);
G03G21/1853 (EP,US);
G03G2221/1633 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2006/49] |
Former [2003/01] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Von einem Bilderzeugungsgerät abnehmbare Arbeitseinheit | [2003/01] | English: | Cartridge detachably mountable on image forming apparatus | [2003/01] | French: | Unité de traitement montée de façon à pouvoir être retirée d'un appareil de formation d'images | [2003/01] | Examination procedure | 29.09.2006 | Examination requested [2006/46] | 03.01.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.07.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.03.2008 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 03.04.2008 | 03.04.2008 | Date of oral proceedings | 03.04.2008 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 28.04.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.08.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 26.08.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.08.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPH05273897 ; | [Y]JPH02135384 ; | [XY]US5953560 (NUMAGAMI ATSUSHI [JP], et al) [X] 1-5,10 * figures 1-4,7,24,25 * * column 14, line 15 - line 38 * * column 18, line 39 - line 62 * * column 19, line 43 - column 20, line 57 * * column 21, line 4 - line 9 * [Y] 6-9; | [XP]EP1168107 (CANON KK [JP]) [XP] 1-9 * figures 1-4,7,11,45,46 * * column 18, line 4 - line 10 * * column 17, line 22 - column 19, line 5 * * column 21, line 18 - line 21 * * column 26, line 14 - line 56 * * column 45, line 30 - column 49, line 13 * * column 48, line 57 - column 49, line 3 * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19940126), vol. 018, no. 050, Database accession no. (P - 1683), & JP05273897 A 19931022 (CANON INC) [X] 1,10 * abstract * * paragraph [0019] * | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19900808), vol. 014, no. 366, Database accession no. (P - 1089), & JP02135384 A 19900524 (CANON INC) [Y] 6-9 * abstract * | Examination | JPS59192275 | JPH0844262 | US6022660 | by applicant | JPS59192275 | JPH02135384 | JPH05273897 | JPH0844262 | US5953560 | US6022660 | EP1168107 |