EP1270957 - Pressure-responsive actuator [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.12.2008 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.08.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 23.09.2009 [2009/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Keihin Corporation 3-17, Shinjuku 4-chome, Shinjuku-ku Tokyo / JP | [2008/08] |
Former [2003/01] | For all designated states Keihin Corporation 3-17, Shinjuku 4-chome, Shinjuku-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Takahashi, Kenji Kakuda Development Center of Keihin Corp., 197-1 Aza Nagare, Kakuda, Kakuda-shi, Miyagi / JP | 02 /
Kudo, Kenji Kakuda Development Center of Keihin Corp., 197-1 Aza Nagare, Kakuda, Kakuda-shi, Miyagi / JP | [2003/01] | Representative(s) | Prechtel, Jörg, et al C/o Weickmann & Weickmann Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Richard-Strauss-Straße 80 81679 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/01] | Prechtel, Jörg, Dipl.-Phys. Dr., et al Weickmann & Weickmann Patentanwälte Postfach 86 08 20 81635 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02013320.3 | 18.06.2002 | [2003/01] | Priority number, date | JP20010189214 | 22.06.2001 Original published format: JP 2001189214 | JP20010189215 | 22.06.2001 Original published format: JP 2001189215 | JP20010201575 | 03.07.2001 Original published format: JP 2001201575 | [2003/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1270957 | Date: | 02.01.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/01] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1270957 | Date: | 28.07.2004 | [2004/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1270957 | Date: | 20.02.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.02.2003 | Classification | IPC: | F15B15/10, F02B27/02 | [2003/11] | CPC: |
F02M35/10321 (EP,US);
F02B27/0215 (EP,US);
F02B27/0263 (EP,US);
F02B27/0273 (EP,US);
F02B27/0284 (EP,US);
F02B27/0294 (EP,US);
F02M35/10045 (EP,US);
F02M35/10052 (EP,US);
F02M35/10065 (EP,US);
F02M35/10072 (EP,US);
F02M35/10111 (EP,US);
F15B15/10 (EP,US);
F02D9/10 (EP,US);
F02D9/16 (EP,US);
F05C2225/08 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2003/01] | F15B15/10, F02D9/02 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2005/16] |
Former [2003/01] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Druckempfindliches Betätigungselement | [2003/01] | English: | Pressure-responsive actuator | [2003/01] | French: | Actionneur sensible à la pression | [2003/01] | Examination procedure | 13.06.2003 | Examination requested [2003/33] | 24.09.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.03.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.08.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.02.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.04.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.10.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.09.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.12.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 28.12.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.11.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.04.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 20.02.2008 | [2009/39] | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]JPH07110010 ; | [XY]JPH01193027 ; | [Y]GB838095 (HANS VON COSSEL, et al) [Y] 9,10 * page 2, line 26 - line 78; figures 1-3 *; | [A]US4056043 (SRIRAMAMURTY DURVASULA V, et al) [A] 1,4 * figure - *; | [Y]US4111570 (MOREL HENRI) [Y] 9,10 * figures 10,11 *; | [A]EP0355960 (AUSTIN ROVER GROUP [GB]) [A] 5-8* column 3, line 27 - line 52; figures 1-4 *; | [A]US5363743 (RADDATZ CLAUS D [US], et al) [A] 1-4 * figure - *; | [Y]US6138628 (ALEX MATTHIAS [DE], et al) [Y] 5-8 * column 2, line 9 - line 22; figure 1 *; | [XY]EP1083310 (RENAULT [FR]) [X] 1,4 * column 7, paragraph 47 - column 8, paragraph 56; figures 4-6 * [Y] 5-8,10-12 | [XY] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19950831), vol. 1995, no. 07, & JP07110010 A 19950425 (NIPPON TEKUNIKA KK) [X] 1-4 * abstract * [Y] 5-12 | [XY] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19891106), vol. 013, no. 485, Database accession no. (M - 887), & JP01193027 A 19890803 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP) [X] 1 * abstract * [Y] 5-12 |