EP1376020 - Method and Device for tempering outdoor air used for rooms ventilation [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 14.11.2014 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.04.2015 | Change - lapse in a contracting state New state(s): CY, LU, TR | published on 20.05.2015 [2015/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Zehnder Verkaufs- und Verwaltungs AG Moortalstrasse 1 5722 Gränichen / CH | [2004/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kriesi, Ruedi, Dr. Meierhofring 42 8820 Wädenswil / CH | [2004/01] | Representative(s) | Brinkmann & Partner Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Am Seestern 8 40547 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/51] | Stenger, Watzke & Ring Intellectual Property Am Seestern 8 40547 Düsseldorf / DE | ||
Former [2004/01] | Stenger, Watzke & Ring Patentanwälte Kaiser-Friedrich-Ring 70 40547 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 02013884.8 | 24.06.2002 | [2004/01] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1376020 | Date: | 02.01.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1376020 | Date: | 07.10.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/41] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP1376020 | Date: | 17.12.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.11.2002 | Classification | IPC: | F24F5/00, F24J3/08 | [2004/01] | CPC: |
F24F5/0046 (EP,US);
F24T10/10 (EP,US);
F24F2005/0057 (EP);
Y02A30/272 (EP);
Y02B10/20 (EP);
Y02B10/40 (EP);
Y02E10/10 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2004/01] | Title | German: | Verfahren sowie Vorrichtung zur Temperierung von Aussenluft für die Wohnungsbelüftung | [2004/01] | English: | Method and Device for tempering outdoor air used for rooms ventilation | [2004/01] | French: | Méthode et dispositif pour tempérer l'air frais servant à la ventilation de locaux | [2004/01] | Examination procedure | 05.12.2003 | Examination requested [2004/06] | 16.07.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.11.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.06.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.06.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.05.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.08.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 19.08.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
29.06.2010
07.07.2010
ADMISSIBLE Danfoss A/S 6430 Nordborg / DK Opponent's representative Knoblauch, Andreas Patentanwälte Dr. Knoblauch PartGmbB Reuterweg 51-53 60323 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/32] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
29.06.2010
07.07.2010
ADMISSIBLE Danfoss A/S DK-6430 Nordborg / DK Opponent's representative Knoblauch, Andreas Patentanwälte Dr. Knoblauch Schlosserstrasse 23 D-60322 Frankfurt / DE | 10.08.2010 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 08.02.2011 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 15.02.2011 | Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M04) | 18.06.2011 | Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor | 27.11.2013 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 27.11.2013 | Date of oral proceedings | 07.04.2014 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 07.04.2014 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 03.09.2014 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 05.11.2014 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 19.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 07.10.2009 | DK | 07.10.2009 | FI | 07.10.2009 | IE | 07.10.2009 | SE | 07.10.2009 | TR | 07.10.2009 | GR | 08.01.2010 | ES | 18.01.2010 | PT | 08.02.2010 | LU | 24.06.2010 | MC | 30.06.2010 | [2015/21] |
Former [2011/07] | DK | 07.10.2009 | |
FI | 07.10.2009 | ||
IE | 07.10.2009 | ||
SE | 07.10.2009 | ||
GR | 08.01.2010 | ||
ES | 18.01.2010 | ||
PT | 08.02.2010 | ||
MC | 30.06.2010 | ||
Former [2010/47] | DK | 07.10.2009 | |
FI | 07.10.2009 | ||
IE | 07.10.2009 | ||
SE | 07.10.2009 | ||
GR | 08.01.2010 | ||
ES | 18.01.2010 | ||
PT | 08.02.2010 | ||
Former [2010/35] | DK | 07.10.2009 | |
FI | 07.10.2009 | ||
IE | 07.10.2009 | ||
SE | 07.10.2009 | ||
ES | 18.01.2010 | ||
PT | 08.02.2010 | ||
Former [2010/22] | FI | 07.10.2009 | |
SE | 07.10.2009 | ||
ES | 18.01.2010 | ||
PT | 08.02.2010 | ||
Former [2010/19] | ES | 18.01.2010 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE2843813 (LAROCHE REINHOLD) [X] 1-7,9,10 * page 10, line 24 - page 13, line 20; figures 1,3; claims 1-3,11 *; | [X]US4325357 (WORMSER ERIC M) [X] 1-11* column W *; | [X]DE19950212 (MOSER PETER [DE]) [X] 1-7,9,10 * column W * | Opposition | DE2843813 | US4325357 | DE19950212 |