EP1270863 - Door leaf [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition procedure closed Status updated on 19.09.2008 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.02.2016 | Change - opposition data/opponents data or that of the opponents representative | published on 23.03.2016 [2016/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Glock, Michael Friedrich-Engels-Strasse 53 07937 Zeulenroda / DE | [2003/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2003/01] | Representative(s) | Kitzhofer, Thomas Prinz & Partner GbR Rundfunkplatz 2 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/01] | Kitzhofer, Thomas, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwälte Prinz & Partner GbR Manzingerweg 7 81241 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02013928.3 | 24.06.2002 | [2003/01] | Priority number, date | DE2001130133 | 22.06.2001 Original published format: DE 10130133 | [2003/01] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1270863 | Date: | 02.01.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/01] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1270863 | Date: | 21.01.2004 | [2004/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1270863 | Date: | 10.11.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.12.2003 | Classification | IPC: | E06B7/02, E06B3/70 | [2004/04] | CPC: |
E06B7/02 (EP);
E06B2003/7094 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2003/01] | E06B7/02 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/01] | Title | German: | Türblatt | [2003/01] | English: | Door leaf | [2003/01] | French: | Vantail de porte | [2003/01] | Examination procedure | 20.02.2004 | Examination requested [2004/17] | 12.05.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.09.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 08.09.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
10.08.2005
27.05.2008
WITHDRAWN Schörghuber Spezialtüren GmbH & Co. Betriebs-KG Neuhaus 3 D-84539 Ampfing / DE Opponent's representative Kastel, Stefan Kastel Patentanwälte St.-Cajetan-Strasse 41 81669 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/12] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
10.08.2005
27.05.2008
WITHDRAWN Schörghuber Spezialtüren GmbH & Co. Betriebs-KG Neuhaus 3 D-84539 Ampfing / DE Opponent's representative Kastel, Stefan Kastel Patentanwälte St.-Cajetan-Strasse 41 81699 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/27] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
10.08.2005
27.05.2008
WITHDRAWN Schörghuber Spezialtüren GmbH & Co. Betriebs-KG Neuhaus 3 D-84539 Ampfing / DE Opponent's representative Kastel, Stefan Flügel Preissner Kastel Schober, Nymphenburger Strasse 20a 80335 München / DE | ||
Former [2005/40] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
10.08.2005
Schörghuber Spezialtüren GmbH & Co. Betriebs-KG Neuhaus 3 D-84539 Ampfing / DE Opponent's representative Kastel, Stefan Flügel Preissner Kastel Schober, Nymphenburger Strasse 20a 80335 München / DE | 14.09.2005 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 23.02.2006 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 29.05.2008 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 20.06.2008 | 29.05.2008 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 05.06.2008 | Despatch of communication that the opposition procedure will be closed | 15.06.2008 | Legal effect of closure of opposition procedure [2008/43] | 20.06.2008 | Date of oral proceedings | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FI | 10.11.2004 | FR | 10.11.2004 | GB | 10.11.2004 | IE | 10.11.2004 | IT | 10.11.2004 | NL | 10.11.2004 | TR | 10.11.2004 | DK | 10.02.2005 | GR | 10.02.2005 | SE | 10.02.2005 | ES | 21.02.2005 | PT | 10.04.2005 | CY | 24.06.2005 | BE | 30.06.2005 | MC | 30.06.2005 | [2008/03] |
Former [2007/37] | FI | 10.11.2004 | |
FR | 10.11.2004 | ||
GB | 10.11.2004 | ||
IE | 10.11.2004 | ||
IT | 10.11.2004 | ||
NL | 10.11.2004 | ||
TR | 10.11.2004 | ||
DK | 10.02.2005 | ||
GR | 10.02.2005 | ||
SE | 10.02.2005 | ||
ES | 21.02.2005 | ||
CY | 24.06.2005 | ||
BE | 30.06.2005 | ||
MC | 30.06.2005 | ||
Former [2007/20] | FI | 10.11.2004 | |
FR | 10.11.2004 | ||
GB | 10.11.2004 | ||
IE | 10.11.2004 | ||
NL | 10.11.2004 | ||
TR | 10.11.2004 | ||
DK | 10.02.2005 | ||
GR | 10.02.2005 | ||
SE | 10.02.2005 | ||
ES | 21.02.2005 | ||
CY | 24.06.2005 | ||
BE | 30.06.2005 | ||
MC | 30.06.2005 | ||
Former [2007/10] | FI | 10.11.2004 | |
FR | 10.11.2004 | ||
GB | 10.11.2004 | ||
IE | 10.11.2004 | ||
NL | 10.11.2004 | ||
TR | 10.11.2004 | ||
DK | 10.02.2005 | ||
GR | 10.02.2005 | ||
SE | 10.02.2005 | ||
ES | 21.02.2005 | ||
BE | 30.06.2005 | ||
MC | 30.06.2005 | ||
Former [2006/52] | FI | 10.11.2004 | |
FR | 10.11.2004 | ||
GB | 10.11.2004 | ||
IE | 10.11.2004 | ||
NL | 10.11.2004 | ||
TR | 10.11.2004 | ||
DK | 10.02.2005 | ||
GR | 10.02.2005 | ||
ES | 21.02.2005 | ||
BE | 30.06.2005 | ||
MC | 30.06.2005 | ||
Former [2006/31] | FI | 10.11.2004 | |
FR | 10.11.2004 | ||
GB | 10.11.2004 | ||
IE | 10.11.2004 | ||
NL | 10.11.2004 | ||
DK | 10.02.2005 | ||
GR | 10.02.2005 | ||
ES | 21.02.2005 | ||
BE | 30.06.2005 | ||
MC | 30.06.2005 | ||
Former [2006/28] | FI | 10.11.2004 | |
GB | 10.11.2004 | ||
IE | 10.11.2004 | ||
NL | 10.11.2004 | ||
DK | 10.02.2005 | ||
GR | 10.02.2005 | ||
ES | 21.02.2005 | ||
BE | 30.06.2005 | ||
MC | 30.06.2005 | ||
Former [2006/25] | FI | 10.11.2004 | |
GB | 10.11.2004 | ||
IE | 10.11.2004 | ||
NL | 10.11.2004 | ||
DK | 10.02.2005 | ||
GR | 10.02.2005 | ||
ES | 21.02.2005 | ||
BE | 30.06.2005 | ||
Former [2006/13] | FI | 10.11.2004 | |
GB | 10.11.2004 | ||
IE | 10.11.2004 | ||
NL | 10.11.2004 | ||
DK | 10.02.2005 | ||
GR | 10.02.2005 | ||
ES | 21.02.2005 | ||
Former [2005/46] | FI | 10.11.2004 | |
IE | 10.11.2004 | ||
DK | 10.02.2005 | ||
GR | 10.02.2005 | ||
ES | 21.02.2005 | ||
Former [2005/27] | FI | 10.11.2004 | |
GR | 10.02.2005 | ||
ES | 21.02.2005 | ||
Former [2005/26] | FI | 10.11.2004 | |
GR | 10.02.2005 | ||
Former [2005/24] | FI | 10.11.2004 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]BE452932 (VAN BRUGGEN, J.) [A] 1-12 * the whole document *; | [A]BE425261 (DE VEN, E.J.) [A] 1-12 * the whole document *; | [A]US5584760 (GREEN JOHN I [US]) [A] 1-12* the whole document * |