EP1270418 - Wrapping machine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.02.2004 Database last updated on 21.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.10.2008 | Change - representative | published on 05.11.2008 [2008/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Atlanta S.r.l. Via Salieri, 1 40024 Castel San Pietro Terme / IT | [2003/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gazzaneo, Francesco Via Dell'Angelo Custade, 70 40100 Bologna / IT | [2003/01] | Representative(s) | Cerbaro, Elena, et al Studio Torta S.p.A. Via Viotti, 9 10121 Torino / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2008/45] | Cerbaro, Elena, et al STUDIO TORTA Via Viotti 9 10121 Torino / IT | ||
Former [2003/01] | Cerbaro, Elena, et al c/o Studio Torta S.r.l. Via Viotti, 9 10121 Torino / IT | Application number, filing date | 02014327.7 | 27.06.2002 | [2003/01] | Priority number, date | IT2001BO00416 | 29.06.2001 Original published format: IT BO20010416 | [2003/01] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1270418 | Date: | 02.01.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.10.2002 | Classification | IPC: | B65B11/02 | [2003/01] | CPC: |
B65B11/025 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2003/39] |
Former [2003/01] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Wickelmaschine | [2003/01] | English: | Wrapping machine | [2003/01] | French: | Machine à banderoler | [2003/01] | Examination procedure | 03.07.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/15] | 07.11.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2004/15] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 22.08.2003 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 22.08.2003 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 22.08.2003 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 22.08.2003 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 22.08.2003 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 22.08.2003 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 22.08.2003 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 22.08.2003 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 22.08.2003 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 22.08.2003 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 22.08.2003 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 22.08.2003 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 22.08.2003 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 22.08.2003 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 22.08.2003 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 22.08.2003 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 22.08.2003 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 22.08.2003 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 22.08.2003 | TR   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 22.08.2003 | M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]FR2383074 (SAINT FRERES [FR]) [X] 1-3 * page 8 - page 9; figures 3-8 *; | [A]GB1594340 (GOLDSTEIN J) [A] 1* the whole document *; | [X]US5040358 (THIMON JACQUES [US]) [X] 1-3 * abstract *; | [X]FR2686313 (THIMON JACQUES [FR]) [X] 1-6 * figures 1-4; claim 15 * |