EP1270395 - Electric driving unit and electric vehicle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.06.2007 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.12.2007 | Change - lapse in a contracting state State(s) deleted from list of lapses: IT | published on 23.01.2008 [2008/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Yamaha Hatsudoki Kabushiki Kaisha 2500 Shingai Iwata-shi, Shizuoka-ken / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2006/30] | For all designated states YAMAHA HATSUDOKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 2500 Shingai Iwata-shi, Shizuoka-ken / JP | ||
Former [2003/01] | For all designated states YAMAHA HATSUDOKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 2500 Shingai Iwata-shi Shizuoka-ken / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Shirazawa, Hideki Yamaha Hatsudoki Kabushiki Kaisha, 2500 Shingai Iwata-shi, Shizuoka-ken / JP | [2003/01] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/01] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02014362.4 | 27.06.2002 | [2003/01] | Priority number, date | JP20010194251 | 27.06.2001 Original published format: JP 2001194251 | [2003/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1270395 | Date: | 02.01.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/01] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1270395 | Date: | 23.03.2005 | [2005/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1270395 | Date: | 26.07.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.02.2005 | Classification | IPC: | B62M23/02, B62M7/12 | [2003/01] | CPC: |
B62M7/12 (EP,US);
B60L50/66 (EP,US);
B62K25/283 (EP,US);
B60G2204/30 (EP,US);
B60L2200/12 (EP,US);
B62K2204/00 (EP,US);
Y02T10/70 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, IT [2005/50] |
Former [2003/01] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Elektrische Einheit und elektrische Fahrzeuge | [2003/01] | English: | Electric driving unit and electric vehicle | [2003/01] | French: | Ensemble électrique et véhicule électrique | [2003/01] | Examination procedure | 15.04.2005 | Examination requested [2005/24] | 05.07.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.09.2005 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 04.11.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.01.2006 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, GB, GR, IE, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | 06.02.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.06.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 07.06.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.04.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 03.11.2005 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 03.11.2005 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 03.11.2005 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 03.11.2005 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 03.11.2005 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 03.11.2005 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 03.11.2005 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 03.11.2005 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 03.11.2005 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 03.11.2005 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 03.11.2005 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 03.11.2005 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 03.11.2005 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 03.11.2005 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 03.11.2005 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 03.11.2005 | TR   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | deleted | [2008/04] |
Former [2007/37] | IT | 26.07.2006 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP4185207 ; | [A]US5691584 (TOIDA NAOYA [JP], et al) [A] 1 * column 9, line 20 - line 40; figure 7 *; | [X]EP0980821 (YAMAHA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1-13 * figure 6 *; | [PA]US6321863 (VANJANI CHANDU R [US]) [PA] 1* column 2, line 1 - line 5; figure - * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19921016), vol. 0165, no. 03, Database accession no. (M - 1326), & JP4185207 A 19920702 (AISIN AW CO LTD) [A] 1 * abstract * | by applicant | JPH1134965 |