EP1376961 - Method for estimating wanted signal parameters and interfering signal parameters from the received signal in a radio communication system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.03.2005 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.03.2005 | Change - inventor | published on 27.04.2005 [2005/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/01] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Frey, Thomas, Dr. Eichhaldenweg 1 89081 Ulm / DE | 02 /
Grundler, Thomas Dauthendeystrasse 2/I 81377 München / DE | 03 /
Kiessling, Mario Lehle 34 89075 Ulm / DE | 04 /
Reinhardt, Markus, Dr. Eisenhower Strasse 23 89231 Neu-Ulm / DE | 05 /
Seeger, Alexander, Dr. Wittelsbacher Strasse 15 85622 Feldkirchen / DE | 06 /
Viering, Ingo Sintpertstrasse 11 81539 München / DE | [2005/17] |
Former [2004/01] | 01 /
Frey, Thomas, Dr. Eichhaldenweg 1 89081 Ulm / DE | ||
02 /
Grundler, Thomas Dauthendeystrasse 2/I 81377 München / DE | |||
03 /
Kiessling, Mario Lehle 34 89075 Ulm / DE | |||
04 /
Reinhardt, Markus, Dr. Eisenhower Strasse 23 89231 Neu-Ulm / DE | |||
05 /
Seeger, Alexander, Dr. Wittelsbacher Strasse 15 85622 Feldkirchen / DE | |||
06 /
Viering, Ingo Heilmeyersteige 156/2 89075 Ulm / DE | Application number, filing date | 02014373.1 | 27.06.2002 | [2004/01] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1376961 | Date: | 02.01.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.11.2002 | Classification | IPC: | H04L25/02, H04B7/08 | [2004/01] | CPC: |
H04L25/0228 (EP);
H04B17/309 (EP);
H04L25/0242 (EP);
H04B17/336 (EP);
H04B7/086 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | [2004/39] |
Former [2004/01] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Ermittlung von Nutzsignalparametern und Störsignalparametern aus einem Empfangssignal eines Funkkommunikationssystems | [2004/01] | English: | Method for estimating wanted signal parameters and interfering signal parameters from the received signal in a radio communication system | [2004/01] | French: | Procédé d'évaluation des paramètres du signal utile et des paramètres du signal parasite à partir du signal reçu dans un systéme de radio-communication | [2004/01] | Examination procedure | 03.07.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/16] | 16.11.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2005/16] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 19.08.2004 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 19.08.2004 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 19.08.2004 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 19.08.2004 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 19.08.2004 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 19.08.2004 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 19.08.2004 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 19.08.2004 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 19.08.2004 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 19.08.2004 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 19.08.2004 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 19.08.2004 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 19.08.2004 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 19.08.2004 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 19.08.2004 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 19.08.2004 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 19.08.2004 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 19.08.2004 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 19.08.2004 | TR   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 19.08.2004 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2004 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US6118832 (MAYRARGUE SYLVIE [FR], et al) [A] 1-7 * abstract * * column 8, line 5 - column 9, line 5 *; | [XA] - CHAUFRAY J-M ET AL, "Consistent estimation of Rayleigh fading channel second-order statistics in the context of the wideband CDMA mode of the UMTS", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON SIGNAL PROCESSING, IEEE, INC. NEW YORK, US, (200112), vol. 49, no. 12, ISSN 1053-587X, pages 3055 - 3064, XP002200959 [X] 1 * Seite 3055, rechte Spalte * * Seite 3057, rechte Spalte - Seite 3058, rechte Spalte * [A] 2-7 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/78.969513 | [T] - VIERING I ET AL, "Improving Uplink Adaptive Antenna Algorithms for WCDMA by Covariance Matrix Compensation", VTC 2002 FALL. IEEE VTS 56TH. VEHICULAR TECHNOLOGY CONFERENCE. VANCOUVER, CANADA, SEPTEMBER 24 - 28, 2002, IEEE VEHICULAR TECHNOLOGY CONFERENCE, NEW YORK, NY: IEEE, US, (20020924), vol. 4, pages 2159 - 2153, XP002219059 [T] 1-7 * the whole document * |